Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008088423 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88095407 | 16.01.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006096236 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2007 | A3 | WO2006096236 | 14.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006096230 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2007 | A3 | WO2006096230 | 14.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9107899 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2015 | B2 | US2014099279 | 10.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213645909 | 05.10.2012 | US33826506 | 24.01.2006 | US27231708 | 17.11.2008 | US63515806 | 01.12.2006 | US34310406 | 30.01.2006 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | WO2007US22862 | 30.10.2007 | US44876307 | 30.10.2007 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | US27228908 | 17.11.2008 | US88095407 | 16.01.2007 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US27235208 | 17.11.2008 | US42934109 | 24.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010168841 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88095407 | 16.01.2007 | WO2007US22862 | 30.10.2007 | US44876307 | 30.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8808618 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2014 | B2 | US2009200177 | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US63515806 | 01.12.2006 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US34310406 | 30.01.2006 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | US42934109 | 24.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7648592 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2010 | B2 | US2009123327 | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | US27235208 | 17.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7648590 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2010 | B2 | US2009076589 | 19.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | US27228908 | 17.11.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7648591 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2010 | B2 | US2009068249 | 12.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33826506 | 24.01.2006 | US27231708 | 17.11.2008 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7540995 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2009 | B2 | US2007077163 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US63515806 | 01.12.2006 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US34310406 | 30.01.2006 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006264914 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69490305 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | US36396706 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7488444 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2009 | B2 | US2006200226 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33826506 | 24.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7452502 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2008 | B2 | US2006200225 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7452501 | Global Dossier | 18.11.2008 | B2 | US2006200224 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7540994 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2009 | B2 | US2006198750 | 07.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US34310406 | 30.01.2006 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5335244B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B2 | JP2008538933 | 13.11.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US02741 | 24.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5068672B | Global Dossier | 07.11.2012 | B2 | JP2008531191 | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | WO2006US03552 | 30.01.2006 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5335243B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B2 | JP2008531189 | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006US00693 | 09.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5335242B | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B2 | JP2008531188 | 14.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | WO2006US00444 | 06.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2104456 | Global Dossier | 14.11.2012 | A4 | EP2104456 | 30.09.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88095407 | 16.01.2007 | WO2007US22862 | 30.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1893780 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2024 | B1 | EP1893780 | 30.03.2011 | A4 | EP1893780 | 05.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | WO2006US00444 | 06.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1868528 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2024 | B1 | EP1868528 | 06.04.2011 | A4 | EP1868528 | 26.12.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | WO2006US03552 | 30.01.2006 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1866453 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2024 | B1 | EP1866453 | 30.03.2011 | A4 | EP1866453 | 19.12.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US00693 | 09.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006221100B | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | B2 | AU2006221100 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US00693 | 09.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006221094B | Global Dossier | 27.01.2011 | B2 | AU2006221094 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US28246105 | 18.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US28237605 | 18.11.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | WO2006US00444 | 06.01.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006221058B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2012 | B2 | AU2006221058 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | WO2006US03552 | 30.01.2006 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006221046B | Global Dossier | 02.02.2012 | B2 | AU2006221046 | 14.09.2006 | A2 | AU2006221046 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US02741 | 24.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1858440 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2024 | B1 | EP1858440 | 30.03.2011 | A4 | EP1858440 | 28.11.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006US02741 | 24.01.2006 | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006096263 | Global Dossier | 05.04.2007 | A3 | WO2006096263 | 14.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006096251 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2009 | A3 | WO2006096251 | 14.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US69489105 | 29.06.2005 | US73968805 | 23.11.2005 | US69488105 | 29.06.2005 | US65822605 | 03.03.2005 |