EP1861438 - CATALYST COMPOSITION COMPRISING SHUTTLING AGENT FOR REGIO-IRREGULAR MULTI-BLOCK COPOLYMER FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/18] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48647 / US | ||
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | ||
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARRIOLA, Daniel, J. 2100 East Mier Road Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | 02 /
CARNAHAN, Edmund, M. 4619 Twin Elm Drive Fresno, Texas 77545 / US | 03 /
DEVORE, David, D. 4901 East Shaffer Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | 04 /
HUSTAD, Phillip, D. 3618 Rose Water Court Manvel, Texas 77578 / US | 05 /
KUHLMAN, Roger, L. 117 Dewberry Drive Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 06 /
WENZEL, Timothy, T. 6909 N. Jefferson Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
ARRIOLA, Daniel, J. 2100 East Mier Road Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | ||
02 /
CARNAHAN, Edmund, M. 4619 Twin Elm Drive Fresno, Texas 77545 / US | |||
03 /
DEVORE, David, D. 4881 East Shaffer Road Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | |||
04 /
HUSTAD, Phillip, D. 3618 Rose Water Court Manvel, Texas 77578 / US | |||
05 /
KUHLMAN, Roger, L. 117 Dewberry Drive Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
06 /
WENZEL, Timothy, T. 6909 N. Jefferson Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | |||
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
ARRIOLA, Daniel, J. 2100 East Mier Road Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | ||
02 /
CARNAHAN, Edmund, M. 4619 Twin Elm Drive Fresno, Texas 77545 / US | |||
03 /
DEVORE, David, D. 4881 East Shaffer Road Midland, Michigan 48642 / US | |||
04 /
HUSTAD, Phillip, D. 3618 Rose Water Court Manvel, Texas 77578 / US | |||
05 /
KUHLMAN, Roger, L. 2533 Spring Street South Charleston, West Virginia 25303 / US | |||
06 /
WENZEL, Timothy, T. 888 Poplar Road Charleston, West Virginia 25302 / US | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2015/10] | Molling, Matheus Catharina, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2007/49] | Molling, Matheus Catharina, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06734046.3 | 30.01.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US03207 | Priority number, date | US20050662939P | 17.03.2005 Original published format: US 662939 P | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101595 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861438 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861438 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/659, C08F210/06, C08F297/06, C08F297/08, C08L23/10, C08L23/20, C08F110/06, C08F110/14 | [2014/37] | CPC: |
C08F210/06 (EP,US);
C08F210/00 (KR);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F110/14 (EP,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F210/16 (KR);
C08F297/06 (EP,US);
C08F297/08 (EP,US);
C08F4/646 (KR);
C08L23/10 (EP,US);
C08L23/20 (EP,US);
C08F2410/01 (EP,US);
C08F2410/04 (EP,US);
C08F4/659 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08L2205/02 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/61904 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/64048 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/64144 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/64165 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7006 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F4/7042 (EP,US);
C08F210/06, C08F2/38 (US,EP);
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2007/49] | C08F297/08, C08F4/646, C08F2/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT TRANSPORTWIRKSTOFF ZUR REGIO-IRREGULÄREN MULTIBLOCK-COPOLYMER-FORMIERUNG | [2007/49] | English: | CATALYST COMPOSITION COMPRISING SHUTTLING AGENT FOR REGIO-IRREGULAR MULTI-BLOCK COPOLYMER FORMATION | [2007/49] | French: | COMPOSITION CATALYTIQUE COMPRENANT UN AGENT NAVETTE POUR LA FORMATION D'UN COPOLYMERE MULTIBLOCS A REGIONS IRREGULIERES | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15151498.1 / EP2894176 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 09.04.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2006 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 30.01.2006 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
TR | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.01.2006 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6124400 (CHIEN JAMES C W [US]) [X] 1-24 * column 4, line 24 - line 32 * * column 5, line 13 - line 18 * * example - *; | [A]US2003088037 (STEVENS JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005090425 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005090426 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO2005090427 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-24* the whole document *; | [X] - PRZYBYLA C ET AL, "Two different on the same silica supported metallocene catalysts, activated by various trialkylaluminums - a kinetic and morphological study as well as an experimental investigation for building stereoblock polymers", ACTA POLYMERICA, VCH, WEINHEIM, DE, (19990421), vol. 50, ISSN 0323-7648, pages 77 - 83, XP002332921 [X] 1-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4044(19990201)50:2/3<77::AID-APOL77>3.0.CO;2-U |