EP1848714 - PHENYL-SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 08543-4000 / US | ||
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 05843-4000 / US | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 & Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WROBELSKI, Stephen, T. 1507 South Branch Drive Whitehouse Station, New Jersey 08889 / US | 02 /
LIN, Shuqun 8 Hunters Way Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | 03 /
LEFTHERIS, Katerina 92 Richmond Drive Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | 04 /
HE, Liqi 3765 Powder Horn Drive Furlong, Pennsylvania 18925 / US | 05 /
SEITZ, Steven, P. 333 Haverford Place Swarthmore, Pennsylvania 19081 / US | 06 /
LIN, Tai-An 83 Mandeville Avenue, Pequannock New Jersey 07440 / US | 07 /
VACCARO, Wayne 1706 Westover Road Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
WROBELSKI, Stephen, T. 1507 South Branch Drive Whitehouse Station, New Jersey 08889 / US | ||
02 /
LIN, Shuqun 8 Hunters Way Newtown, Pennsylvania 18940 / US | |||
03 /
LEFTHERIS, Katerina 92 Richmond Drive Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | |||
04 /
HE, Liqi 3765 Powder Horn Drive Furlong, Pennsylvania 18925 / US | |||
05 /
SEITZ, Steven, P. 333 Haverford Place Swarthmore, Pennsylvania 19081 / US | |||
06 /
LIN, Tai-An 2153 W. Wellington Road Newtown, PA 18940 / US | |||
07 /
VACCARO, Wayne 1706 Westover Road Yardley, Pennsylvania 19067 / US | Representative(s) | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | Beacham, Annabel Rose, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06734200.6 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US03659 | Priority number, date | US20050650077P | 04.02.2005 Original published format: US 650077 P | US20060344881 | 01.02.2006 Original published format: US 344881 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006084017 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848714 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848714 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/04, C07D417/14, C07D401/04, A61P29/00, A61P35/00 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHENYLSUBSTITUIERTE PYRIMIDINVERBINDUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS KINASEHEMMER | [2007/44] | English: | PHENYL-SUBSTITUTED PYRIMIDINE COMPOUNDS USEFUL AS KINASE INHIBITORS | [2007/44] | French: | COMPOSES PYRIMIDINE A SUBSTITUTION PHENYLE UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE KINASES | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.2009 | BE | 30.12.2009 | CY | 30.12.2009 | CZ | 30.12.2009 | DK | 30.12.2009 | EE | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | LT | 30.12.2009 | LV | 30.12.2009 | NL | 30.12.2009 | PL | 30.12.2009 | RO | 30.12.2009 | SE | 30.12.2009 | SI | 30.12.2009 | SK | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | IE | 02.02.2010 | LU | 02.02.2010 | CH | 28.02.2010 | LI | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | BG | 30.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IS | 30.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | HU | 01.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.02.2010 | ||
LU | 02.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
HU | 01.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.02.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
CH | 28.02.2010 | ||
LI | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 30.12.2009 | ||
EE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
RO | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SK | 30.12.2009 | ||
BG | 30.03.2010 | ||
IS | 30.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
LT | 30.12.2009 | ||
LV | 30.12.2009 | ||
PL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
SI | 30.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2201083 (FERLUX [FR]) [X] 5,6,8-14 * Ex. V *; | [A]WO03029248 (CYCLACEL LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-7,9,12,13,15-18* the whole document *; | [X]WO2004080979 (LG LIFE SCIENCES LTD [KR], et al) [X] 5,6,8-14 * examples 5-7 *; | [X]WO2004087679 (APONETICS AG [CH], et al) [X] 5,6,8-15,17,19 * examples 42-45 *; | [X]WO2004096797 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-7,9,12,13,15-18 * page 21 - page 23; example 77; claim 1 *; | [PX]WO2005079801 (VERNALIS R & D LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 5,6,8-14 * examples 183-195 *; | [PX]WO2005113514 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PX] 5,6,8-14 * compounds 31,32,43 *; | [X] - OBRECHT D ET AL, "5. A NOVEL AND EFFICIENT APPROACH FOR THE COMBINATORIAL SYNTHESIS OF STRUCTURALLY DIVERSE PYRIMIDINES ON SOLID SUPPORT", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL, CH, (1997), vol. 80, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 65 - 72, XP002915327 [X] 5,6,8-14 * Cpds. 9a-9e,10-13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19970800106 | Examination | WO2004071440 |