EP1848552 - SPUTTERING TARGET AND METHOD OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Advanced Metals, USA, Inc. 880 Winter Street Waltham MA 02451 / US | [2012/46] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Cabot Corporation 2 Seaport Lane Suite 1300 Boston MA 02210-2019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WICKERSHAM, Charles, E., Jr. 571 Arden Road Columbus, OH 43214 / US | 02 /
LEVIT, Vladimir, I. 177 Woodsview Way Hillard, OH 32026 / US | 03 /
ALEXANDER, P., Todd 856 Farragut Road Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06734440.8 | 07.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006US04143 | Priority number, date | US20050055535 | 10.02.2005 Original published format: US 55535 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006086319 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848552 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848552 | Date: | 10.10.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21B1/02, B21B1/38, C23C14/34 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C22C27/02 (EP,US);
B21B1/02 (EP,KR,US);
B21B1/38 (KR);
B21H1/02 (EP,US);
C22F1/18 (EP,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Title | German: | SPUTTERTARGET UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/44] | English: | SPUTTERING TARGET AND METHOD OF FABRICATION | [2007/44] | French: | CIBLE DE PULVERISATION ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2006 | BE | 10.10.2012 | CY | 10.10.2012 | CZ | 10.10.2012 | DK | 10.10.2012 | EE | 10.10.2012 | FI | 10.10.2012 | IT | 10.10.2012 | LT | 10.10.2012 | LV | 10.10.2012 | NL | 10.10.2012 | PL | 10.10.2012 | RO | 10.10.2012 | SE | 10.10.2012 | SI | 10.10.2012 | SK | 10.10.2012 | TR | 10.10.2012 | BG | 10.01.2013 | GR | 11.01.2013 | ES | 21.01.2013 | GB | 07.02.2013 | IE | 07.02.2013 | LU | 07.02.2013 | IS | 10.02.2013 | PT | 11.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
TR | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
GB | 07.02.2013 | ||
IE | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
GB | 07.02.2013 | ||
IE | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 07.02.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
IT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
RO | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
CZ | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
EE | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
SK | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
DK | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
BG | 10.01.2013 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
PT | 11.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | BE | 10.10.2012 | |
CY | 10.10.2012 | ||
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
GR | 11.01.2013 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 10.10.2012 | |
FI | 10.10.2012 | ||
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
LV | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
PL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 10.10.2012 | |
LT | 10.10.2012 | ||
NL | 10.10.2012 | ||
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
ES | 21.01.2013 | ||
IS | 10.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SE | 10.10.2012 | ||
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 10.10.2012 | |
SI | 10.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | SI | 10.10.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE645631 (KRONPRINZ A G FUER METALLINDUS) [X] 1,3,18,19,22-24,26,27 * page 1; figure 1; claims 1,4 * [Y] 2,4,5,7-9,14-17,25; | [X]US6302977 (LIU YINSHI [US]) [X] 1,3,18,19,22-24,26,27 * figures 1,11; claims 1,6,7 *; | [DX]US6348113 (MICHALUK CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,18,19,22-24,26,27* claims 1,6 *; | [XY]WO0236847 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [X] 1,24 * page 12, line 15 - line 21; figure 2 * [Y] 2,4,5,7-9,14-17,25; | [X]WO0242513 (CABOT CORP [US]) [X] 1,3,18,19,22-24,26,27 * figures 4a,4b,5 *; | [XY]WO02070765 (STARCK H C INC [US], et al) [X] 1,24 * figure 1 * [Y] 2,4,5,7-9,14-17,25; | [DX]US2002153071 (SEGAL V M [US], et al) [DX] 1,3,18,19,22-24,26,27 * figures 2,3; claims 14,33 *; | [X]WO2004111295 (CABOT CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,18,19,22-24,26,27 * figures 1A,1B,2-5; claims 1,8,9 * | by applicant | DE645631 | US4884746 | US5615465 | US6193821 | US6238494 | US6348113 | US6348139 | US2002063056 | US2002112789 | US2002125128 | US6462339 | US2002153071 | US2003089429 | US20030089429 |