EP1851778 - METHOD OF MAKING MULTILAYERED CONSTRUCTION FOR USE IN RESISTORS AND CAPACITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oak-Mitsui, Inc. 80 1st Street Hoosick Falls New York 12090 / US | [2007/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRESAKIS, John, A. 60 Longwood Drive Clifton Park, N. Y. 12065 / US | 02 /
PRAMANIK, Pranabes K. 45 Longwood Drive Clifton Park, N. Y. 12065 / US | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/45] | 01 /
ANDRESAKIS, John, A. 60 Longwood Drive Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | ||
02 /
PRAMANIK, Pranabes K. 45 Longwood Drive Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | Representative(s) | von Eichel-Streiber, Caspar, et al Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | [2013/04] |
Former [2012/32] | Fleck, Thomas Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Grosse Bleichen 8 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | Fleck, Thomas Raffay & Fleck Patentanwälte Geffckenstrasse 6 20249 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06735203.9 | 15.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US05424 | Priority number, date | US20050062784 | 22.02.2005 Original published format: US 62784 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006091463 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1851778 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851778 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01G7/00, H05K3/20, H01G4/20 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
H01G4/203 (EP,US);
H01L21/3205 (KR);
H01C17/065 (EP,US);
H01G4/30 (EP,US);
H05K1/162 (EP,US);
H05K1/167 (EP,US);
H05K1/036 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0355 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0361 (EP,US);
H05K2203/0723 (EP,US);
Y10T29/43 (EP,US);
Y10T29/435 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49126 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49128 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/22] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRSCHICHTIGEN KONSTRUKTION ZUR VERWENDUNG IN WIDERSTÄNDEN UND KONDENSATOREN | [2007/45] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING MULTILAYERED CONSTRUCTION FOR USE IN RESISTORS AND CAPACITORS | [2007/45] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS MULTICOUCHES DESTINEES A LA FORMATION DE RESISTANCES ET DE CONDENSATEURS | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/45] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CONSTRUCTIONS MULTICOUCHES DESTINEES A FORMATION DE RESISTANCES ET DE CONDENSATEURS | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 17.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 08.08.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | GB | 15.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | [2014/09] |
Former [2014/07] | IT | 08.08.2012 | |
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | IT | 08.08.2012 | |
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | ES | 19.11.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6215649 (APPELT BERND K [US], et al) [A] 1-26* column 4, line 50 - line 61; figure 5B *; | [DA]US6693793 (KUWAKO FUJIO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-26 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004128822 (TUNG I-CHUNG [TW]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0027]; figure 3 * | International search | [X]US6693793 (KUWAKO FUJIO [JP], et al); | [A]US6657849 (ANDRESAKIS JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US5689879 (URASAKI NAOYUKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | US6693793 | US5679230 |