EP1858975 - MODIFIED NOVOLAK RESIN FOR USE AS TACKIFIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SI Group, Inc. 2750 Balltown Road Schenectady, NY 12309 / US | [2014/37] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states SCHENECTADY INTERNATIONAL, INC. Post Office Box 1046 Schenectady New York 12301 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BANACH, Timothy Edward 26 Cedar Lane Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 02 /
HOWARD, Leigh, Scott 744 Goode Street Ballston Spa, New York 12020 / US | 03 /
PEARSALL, Dominic Maxwell 67 Emery Street Walsall, West Midland WS1 3AW / GB | 04 /
KNEZEVIC, Milan@Ruo Joao Polastri 800 Condominio Jardim Botanica Casa 73 CEP-13510-910 Rio Claro / BR | 05 /
SIUDY, Mark, Edward 168 Bernaski Road Amsterdam, New York 12010 / US | [2014/23] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
BANACH, Timothy Edward 26 Cedar Lane Scotia, New York 12302 / US | ||
02 /
HOWARD, Leigh, Scott 744 Goode Street Ballston Spa, New York 12020 / US | |||
03 /
PEARSALL, Dominic Maxwell 67 Emery Street Walsall, West Midland WS1 3AW / GB | |||
04 /
KNEZEVIC, Milan Ruo Joao Polastri 800 Condominio Jardim Botanica Casa 73 CEP-13510-910 Rio Claro / BR | |||
05 /
SIUDY, Mark, Edward 168 Bernaski Road Amsterdam, New York 12010 / US | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12 68165 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 06735207.0 | 16.02.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006US05428 | Priority number, date | US20050655914P | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 655914 P | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006093676 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1858975 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858975 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1858975 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/00, C08L21/00, C08G8/30, C08F283/06, C08L51/08 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
C08G8/30 (EP,US);
C08G8/00 (KR);
C08F283/00 (EP,US);
C08F283/06 (EP,US);
C08G8/10 (KR);
C08G8/28 (EP,US);
C08G8/38 (KR);
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L51/08 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08L61/14 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L21/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/16 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/08, C08L2666/04 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2008/07] | C08F283/00, C08L21/00, C08G8/30 | ||
Former IPC [2007/48] | C08L61/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTES NOVOLAKHARZ ZUR VERWENDUNG ALS KLEBRIGMACHER | [2007/48] | English: | MODIFIED NOVOLAK RESIN FOR USE AS TACKIFIER | [2007/48] | French: | RESINE NOVOLAK MODIFIEE UTILISABLE COMME AGENT DONNANT DU COLLANT | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 04.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | IE | 16.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/07] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1349615 (BERGER JENSON & NICHOLSON LTD) [X] 1,2,6,8,9 * page 2, line 27-28 - "substituted phenols" * * page 2, line 35 "polyvinyls" * * page 2, lines 27-45; example VI *; | [X]GB1448374 (HOECHST AG) [X] 1-17 * claim 6 * * claim 13 "butyl phenol" * * claims 21-24,27 * * page 2, lines 67-88 * * claim 33 "rubber composition" * * example - *; | [X]GB1484278 (UNIROYAL LTD) [X] 1,2,4-9,11,12 * claim 21 * * claim 22 * * claim 19 * * page 4, lines 20-24 *; | [A]US4083891 (BOWERS LEWIS H, et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-6 ** example - *; | [A]US4094834 (BOWERS LEWIS H, et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-9 * * example - *; | [X]US4632966 (KANAGAWA SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6-10 * column 2, lines 7-10 * * claims 2,4 * * claim 14 * | International search | [A]JPH0920819 ; | [A]US4073776 (GALKIEWICZ THOMAS M, et al); | [A]US4167540 (GILLER ARNOLD, et al); | [A]US4260704 (SCHMIDT MANFRED, et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, & JP09020819 A 19970121 (NIPPON KAYAKU CO LTD) |