EP1901798 - SQUEEZE-ACTUATED CATHETER CONNECTOR AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway Minneapolis MN 55432-5604 / US | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states MEDTRONIC, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NELSON, Brian D 18 Oakridge Drive Birchwood, Minnesota 55110 / US | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2008/13] | Hughes, Andrea Michelle Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06735280.7 | 16.02.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006US05532 | Priority number, date | US20050682949P | 20.05.2005 Original published format: US 682949 P | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006127072 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1901798 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1901798 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M39/12, A61M5/142 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
A61M39/12 (EP,US);
F16L37/0985 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1027 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1044 (EP,US);
A61M39/1011 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/13] | Title | German: | DURCH QUETSCHEN BETÄTIGTER KATHETERKONNEKTOR UND VERFAHREN | [2008/13] | English: | SQUEEZE-ACTUATED CATHETER CONNECTOR AND METHOD | [2008/13] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE CATHETER A ACTIONNEMENT PAR PRESSION ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 12.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2006 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | IS | 22.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | GB | 16.02.2014 | IE | 16.02.2014 | LU | 16.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.02.2006 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 16.02.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 16.02.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
GB | 16.02.2014 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 16.02.2014 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
LU | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IS | 22.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
PT | 23.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE9013145U (B. BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG, 3508 MELSUNGEN, DE) [X] 1-3,5,14,22 * page 6, line 1 - page 10, line L; figure - *; | [XA]FR2750055 (BRAUN CELSA SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,14,15,22,23 * page 5, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 2; figure - * [A] 6,7; | [X]GB2343723 (RICHARDSON MARGARET PAMELA [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14 * page 9, line 18 - page 13, line 22; figure - *; | [E]WO2006036192 (MEDTRONIC INC [US], et al) [E] 1-3,12,14* page 5, line 12 - page 19, line 2; figure - * |