EP1850852 - USE OF SILDENAFIL, VARDENAFIL AND OTHER 5-PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS TO ENHANCE PERMEABILITY OF THE ABNORMAL BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.12.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Cedars-Sinai Medical Center 8700 Beverly Boulevard Los Angeles California 90048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLACK, Keith 1233 Roberto Lane Los Angeles, California 90077 / US | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Wells, Andrew, et al HGF Limited 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Wells, Andrew, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 4th Floor, Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | ||
Former [2007/45] | Banford, Paul Clifford, et al Marks & Clerk, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 06735574.3 | 22.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006US05980 | Priority number, date | US20050655075P | 22.02.2005 Original published format: US 655075 P | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006091542 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1850852 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/22, A61P25/28, A61K31/44, A61K31/415 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
A61K31/415 (EP,US);
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | A01N43/42, A01N43/50, A61K31/44, A61K31/415 | ||
Former IPC [2007/45] | A61K31/519 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON SILDENAFIL, VARDENAFIL UND ANDEREN 5-PHOSPHODIESTERASE-HEMMERN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER DURCHLÄSSIGKEIT DER ABNORMALEN BLUT-HIRN-SCHRANKE | [2007/45] | English: | USE OF SILDENAFIL, VARDENAFIL AND OTHER 5-PHOSPHODIESTERASE INHIBITORS TO ENHANCE PERMEABILITY OF THE ABNORMAL BLOOD-BRAIN BARRIER | [2007/45] | French: | UTILISATION DU SILDENAFIL, DU VARDENAFIL ET D'AUTRES INHIBITEURS DE LA 5-PHOSPHODIESTERASE POUR AUGMENTER LA PERMEABILITE D'UNE BARRIERE SANG /CERVEAU ANORMALE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/03] | 20.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.02.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9924053 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [X] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [X] - SUGITA MASAO ET AL, "Cyclic GMP-specific phosphodiesterase inhibition and intracarotid bradykinin infusion enhances permeability into brain tumors", CANCER RESEARCH, (19980301), vol. 58, no. 5, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 914 - 920, XP002548317 [X] 1-28 * the whole document * | [PX] - BLACK K L ET AL, "PDE5 inhibitors enhance tumor permeability and efficacy of chemotherapy in a rat brain tumor model", BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 1230, ISSN 0006-8993, (20080916), pages 290 - 302, (20080714), XP024521420 [PX] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.brainres.2008.06.122 | International search | [Y]US2002094326 (DONAHUE J KEVIN [US], et al); | [Y] - PHILLIPS, B.G. ET AL., CIRCULATION, (2000), vol. 102, pages 3068 - 3073, XP008122152 |