EP1855950 - CARTON WITH DISPLAY FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, Inc. 814 Livingston Court Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBUSK, Patrick, James 206 Springs Crossing Canton, GA 30114 / US | 02 /
COLTRI-JOHNSON, Andrea 705 Powers Ferry Road 801 Marietta, Georgia 30067 / US | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/47] | 01 /
DEBUSK, Patrick, James 206 Springs Crossing Canton, GA 30114 / US | ||
02 /
COLTRI-JOHNSON, Andrea 3916 Woodlands Drive Smyrna, GA 30080 / US | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06736318.4 | 24.02.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US06976 | Priority number, date | US20050656240P | 25.02.2005 Original published format: US 656240 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006091958 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855950 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/52, B65D71/14 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
B65D71/36 (EP,US);
A47F5/112 (EP,US);
A47F7/283 (EP,US);
B65D5/0227 (EP,US);
B65D5/5286 (EP,US);
B65D5/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KARTON MIT ANZEIGEFUNKTIONEN | [2007/47] | English: | CARTON WITH DISPLAY FEATURES | [2007/47] | French: | Carton de présentation | [2009/28] |
Former [2007/47] | CARTON À FONCTIONNALITÉS D AFFICHAGE | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/09] | 07.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3132744 (SCHARF BEN C) [X] 1-4,6,10-14,16,19-30 * column 3, line 70 - column 4, line 40 * * figures 5,7-9 *; | [X]DE7120656U (EDER WALDBURG DR [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,10-14,16,19,21,22,27-29 * the whole document *; | [A]GB869380 (ROBERT SKARSTEDT AKTIEBOLAG) [A] 5,7,8,15,17,18 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 72 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2002185499 (HARRELSON GLENN R [US], et al) [A] 9 * abstract * * figures 5-7 * |