EP1854284 - APPARATUSAND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ENHANCEMENTS TO ATSC NETWORKS USING SYNCHRONOUS VESTIGIAL SIDEBAND (VSB) FRAME SLICING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/46] | APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING ENHANCEMENTS TO ATSC NETWORKS USING SYNCHRONOUS VESTIGIAL SIDEBAND (VSB) FRAME SLICING | ||
[2018/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohde & Schwarz GmbH & Co. KG Mühldorfstrasse 15 81671 München / DE | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Michael 6471 Forest Hills Court Frederick, Maryland 21701 / US | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [2019/19] |
Former [2007/46] | Körfer, Thomas Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06736559.3 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/46] | WO2006US07265 | Priority number, date | US20050657416P | 02.03.2005 Original published format: US 657416 P | US20050668094P | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 668094 P | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006094054 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1854284 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854284 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/455, H04L1/00, H04L27/02, H04L27/04, H04N21/242, H04N21/61, H04N21/2383, H04N21/234, H04N21/438 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
H04L27/02 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/235 (KR);
H04L1/0057 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/0065 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/0083 (EP,BR,US);
H04L27/04 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/23412 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/2383 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/242 (EP,BR,US);
H04N21/43 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2008/02] | H04N5/455 | ||
Former IPC [2007/46] | H04N5/38, H04N7/173 | Designated contracting states | DE [2019/19] |
Former [2008/24] | DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON VERSTÄRKTEN ATSC-NETZEN MITTELS SYNCHRONEM RESTSEITENBAND-FRAME-SLICING | [2018/47] | English: | APPARATUSAND METHOD FOR PROVIDING ENHANCEMENTS TO ATSC NETWORKS USING SYNCHRONOUS VESTIGIAL SIDEBAND (VSB) FRAME SLICING | [2018/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LES RESEAUX ATSC PAR UN DECOUPAGE SYNCHRONE DE TRAMES DE BANDE LATERALE RESIDUELLE (VSB) | [2018/47] |
Former [2007/46] | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON VERSTÄRKTEN ATSC-NETZEN MITTELS SYNCHRONEM RESTSEITENBAND-FRAME-SLICING | ||
Former [2007/46] | APPARATUS, SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING ENHANCEMENTS TO ATSC NETWORKS USING SYNCHRONOUS VESTIGIAL SIDEBAND (VSB) FRAME SLICING | ||
Former [2007/46] | DISPOSITIF, SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LES RESEAUX ATSC PAR UN DECOUPAGE SYNCHRONE DE TRAMES DE BANDE LATERALE RESIDUELLE (VSB) | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 05.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2004062183 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 20,21,65 * page 1, line 17 - page 9, line 4 * * page 15, line 23 - line 35 * * page 18, line 1 - page 35, line 15 ** figure 3 *; | [X] - YONG-TAE LEE ET AL, "ATSC TERRESTRIAL DIGITAL TELEVISION BROADCASTING USING SINGLE FREQUENCY NETWORKS", ETRI JOURNAL, (20040401), vol. 26, no. 2, ISSN 1225-6463, pages 92 - 100, XP002556814 [X] 20,21,65 * section II - section V * * figures 1-3, 7-9 * | [I] - ATSC, "Annex D: RF/Transmission Characteristics", DIGITAL TELEVISION STANDARD, XX, XX, (19950916), pages 46 - 60, XP002187665 [I] 20,21,65 * section 4 - section 5 * * figures 2, 7, 15 * | International search | [A]US6130898 (KOSTRESKI BRUCE [US], et al); | [A]US2002097336 (OSHIMA MITSUAKI [JP]); | [X]US2002140867 (WEISS S MERRILL [US]); | [A]US6477180 (AGGARWAL CHARU C [US], et al) | Examination | WO9410802 |