EP1859048 - STABILIZING THE ACTIVITY OF PQQ-DEPENDENT GLUCOSE DEHYDROGENASE IN ELECTROCHEMICAL BIOSENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 100 Bayer Boulevard Whippany, NJ 07981-0915 / US | [2013/49] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Bayer HealthCare LLC 555 White Plains Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHU, Amy, H. 22460 Country Road 10 Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US | 02 /
SPRADLIN, Hope, G. 10232 Ashley's Meadow Drive Granger, Indiana 46530 / US | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Linhart, Angela Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH IPO-P-MON Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2012/52] |
Former [2009/37] | Burkert, Frank Bayer Schering Pharma Aktiengesellschaft Law and Patents Patents and Licensing Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Burkert, Frank Bayer HealthCare AG LP-PL, Q18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06737095.7 | 03.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006US07875 | Priority number, date | US20050658634P | 04.03.2005 Original published format: US 658634 P | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096619 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1859048 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859048 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/00, G01N33/487 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C12Q1/006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/32 (KR);
C12Q1/00 (KR);
C12Q1/004 (EP,US);
C12Q1/26 (KR);
G01N27/3271 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG DER STABILITÄT VON PQQ-ABHÄNGIGER GLUKOSEDEHYDROGENASE IN ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN BIOSENSOREN | [2014/09] | English: | STABILIZING THE ACTIVITY OF PQQ-DEPENDENT GLUCOSE DEHYDROGENASE IN ELECTROCHEMICAL BIOSENSORS | [2007/48] | French: | STABILISATION D'ACTIVITE ENZYMATIQUE DE BIOCAPTEURS ELECTROCHIMIQUES | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/48] | STABILISIERUNG DER AKTIVITÄT VON PQQ-ABHÄNGIGER GLUCOSEDEHYDROGENASE BEI ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN BIOSENSOREN | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.01.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 01.02.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 12.12.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.12.2013 | 17.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2006 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BE | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | ES | 18.06.2014 | FI | 18.06.2014 | IT | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | NL | 18.06.2014 | PL | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | PT | 20.10.2014 | GB | 03.03.2015 | IE | 03.03.2015 | LU | 03.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
GB | 03.03.2015 | ||
IE | 03.03.2015 | ||
LU | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
LU | 03.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BE | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
IT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
NL | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
PL | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
PT | 20.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
ES | 18.06.2014 | ||
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
FI | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004113917 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-28 * examples 1,3,4 *; | [X]US6455001 (KNAPPE WOLFGANG-REINHOLD [DE], et al) [X] 1-17 * example 2 *; | [Y]EP0992589 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * paragraph [0003]; examples 1,2; tables 1,2 *; | [Y]US6736957 (FORROW NIGEL J [GB], et al) [Y] 1-29 * column 8, lines 57-67; column10, lines 29-47; column 10, line 66 - column 11, line 18; table 2; example 4 *; | [A]US2004157339 (BURKE DAVID W [US], et al) [A] * abstract * | [X] - LAURINAVICIUS V ET AL, "Oxygen insensitive glucose biosensor based on PQQ-dependent glucose dehydrogenase", ANALYTICAL LETTERS, (199901), vol. 32, no. 2, ISSN 0003-2719, pages 299 - 316, XP009070271 [X] 1-29 * paragraph bridging pages 302-303; figures 1-2; from the last paragraph on page 307 to the first paragraph on page 309 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00032719908542822 | by applicant | US6455001 | WO2004113917 | EP0992589 | - LAURINAVICIUS V. ET AL., ANALYTICAL LETTERS, (1999), vol. 32, no. 2, pages 299 - 316 |