EP1861135 - NEEDLE SHIELDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.11.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erskine Medical LLC 280 Mohonk Road High Falls, NY 12440 / US | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERSKINE, Timothy P.O. Box 196 11593 Beach Road Sister Bay, WI 54234 / US | [2014/01] |
Former [2008/03] | 01 /
ERSKINE, Timothy P.O. Box 196 11593 Beach Road Sister Bay, WI 54234 / US | ||
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
ERSKINE, Timothy 1160 Stone Valley Way Sandy, Utah 84095 / US | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2007/49] | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06737126.0 | 06.03.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US07910 | Priority number, date | US20050659213P | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 659213 P | US20050659217P | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 659217 P | US20050659226P | 07.03.2005 Original published format: US 659226 P | US20050714954P | 07.09.2005 Original published format: US 714954 P | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006096634 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861135 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861135 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M25/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61M25/0631 (EP,US);
A61M25/0618 (EP,US);
A61M25/0625 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3247 (EP,US);
A61M2005/325 (EP,US);
A61M5/158 (EP,US);
A61M5/3269 (EP,US);
A61M5/3271 (EP,US);
A61M5/3273 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/49] | A61M5/00, A61M5/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/49] | Title | German: | NADELSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG | [2007/49] | English: | NEEDLE SHIELDING DEVICE | [2007/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION D'AIGUILLE | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP12169713.0 / EP2494999 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.02.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 21.02.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.03.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.03.2006 | AT | 01.01.2014 | BE | 01.01.2014 | BG | 01.01.2014 | CY | 01.01.2014 | CZ | 01.01.2014 | DK | 01.01.2014 | EE | 01.01.2014 | FI | 01.01.2014 | LT | 01.01.2014 | LV | 01.01.2014 | MC | 01.01.2014 | PL | 01.01.2014 | RO | 01.01.2014 | SI | 01.01.2014 | SK | 01.01.2014 | TR | 01.01.2014 | LU | 06.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | GR | 02.04.2014 | IS | 01.05.2014 | PT | 02.05.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.03.2006 | |
AT | 01.01.2014 | ||
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
GR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
MC | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
BG | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SI | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
PL | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
SK | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
RO | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 01.01.2014 | ||
DK | 01.01.2014 | ||
EE | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
LU | 06.03.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
BE | 01.01.2014 | ||
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
LV | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 01.01.2014 | |
CY | 01.01.2014 | ||
FI | 01.01.2014 | ||
LT | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 01.05.2014 | ||
PT | 02.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 01.01.2014 | |
IS | 01.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4887998 (MARTIN CATHERINE L [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 37; figures 4,5,9 *; | [A]FR2767480 (PEGAITAZ RAPHAEL [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [X]US5322517 (SIRCOM RICHARD C [CA], et al); | [Y]US5697907 (GABA RODOLFO [US]); | [Y]US6860871 (KURACINA THOMAS C [US], et al); | [Y]US5059180 (MCLEES DONALD J [US]) | by applicant | US5322517 | US4887998 |