EP1866530 - DOUBLE PISTON CYCLE ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tour Engine, Inc. 6340 Raydel Ct. San Diego, CA 92120 / US | [2020/31] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Tour Engine, Inc. 6340 Raydel Ct. San Diego, CA 92120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOUR, Benjamin 6340 Raydel Ct. San Diego, California 92120 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2020/31] |
Former [2007/51] | Hatzmann, Martin VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 06737682.2 | 09.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US08526 | Priority number, date | US20050661195P | 11.03.2005 Original published format: US 661195 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006099106 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866530 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866530 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02B25/08, F02B75/28 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
F02B25/08 (EP,KR,US);
F02B75/28 (EP,KR,US);
F01L3/205 (EP,US);
F02B41/00 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/31] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DOPPELKOLBENZYKLUSMOTOR | [2007/51] | English: | DOUBLE PISTON CYCLE ENGINE | [2007/51] | French: | MOTEUR DPCE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 19.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2008 | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2010 | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.2011 | 31.03.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2014 | 31.03.2016 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   10.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2006 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | IT | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | TR | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | IE | 09.03.2021 | LU | 09.03.2021 | BE | 31.03.2021 | CH | 31.03.2021 | LI | 31.03.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/27] | HU | 09.03.2006 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.03.2021 | ||
BE | 31.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.03.2021 | ||
CH | 31.03.2021 | ||
LI | 31.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
IE | 09.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
IT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9301007U (-) [X] 1-4,6,10,14,21 * figures 1-3 *[I] 5,7-9,11,13,15-18,20,22,23,25-27 | International search | [X]US2005016475 (SCUDERI SALVATORE C [US], et al) | by applicant | US3959974 | DE9301007U | US5623894 |