EP1879586 - NUTRITIONAL PREPARATIONS COMPRISING FOLATES AND ESSENTIAL FATTY ACIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sciele Pharma, Inc. 6195 Shiloh Road Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US | [2008/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDWARDS, John B. 1280 W. Peachtree Street, No. 3710 Atlanta, GA 30309 / US | 02 /
ERLANDSON, Lori, T. 3715 Wescott Way Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | 03 /
GRIFFIN, Edward, Nicholas 2030 Bentwood Court Cumming, GA 30041 / US | 04 /
ROBERTS, Alan, T. 5054 Winding Hills Lane Woodstock, GA 30189 / US | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06737924.8 | 09.03.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006US08794 | Priority number, date | US20050660419P | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 660419 P | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006099237 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1879586 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K31/202, A23L1/30, A23L1/302 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,KR,US);
A23L33/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/202, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/1868, A23V2250/7056 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | GR, PL, TR [2008/16] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOLATE UND ESSENTIELLE FETTSÄUREN ENTHALTENDE NAHRUNGSERGÄNZUNGSMITTEL | [2008/04] | English: | NUTRITIONAL PREPARATIONS COMPRISING FOLATES AND ESSENTIAL FATTY ACIDS | [2008/04] | French: | PREPARATIONS NUTRITIVES CONTENANT DE LA FOLATE ET DES ACIDES GRAS ESSENTIELLES | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/15] | 11.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005037065 (KIRSCHNER MITCHELL I [US], et al) [X] 1-14,24-30,42-45 * paragraphs [0041] , [0043] , [0059] - [0063] - [0071] , [0072] * [Y] 31-41; | [X]US2003108594 (MANNING PAUL B [US], et al) [X] 15-23 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004091317 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 15-23 * example 1; claim - *; | [XY]WO0103696 (SCARISTA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-14,24-30,42-45 * page 2, line 20 - line 26 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 10, paragraph L - page 11, paragraph 2; examples 1,5-8; claim - * [Y] 31-41; | [Y]WO2004000042 (NUTRICIA NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-45 * page 7, paragraph 3; example 12; claim - * * page 10, paragraph 5 *; | [Y]WO03017945 (MARTEK BIOSCIENCES BOULDER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-45 * page 5, paragraph 1 - page 7, paragraph 1; example -; claim - *; | [PX]WO2005112654 (PBM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-45 * page 31, paragraphs 5,6; claims 1,7,9-15,33,37,52-60 * * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 40, paragraph 4 * * page 49, paragraph L *; | [XP]US2005147665 (HORROBIN DAVID F [GB], et al) [XP] 1-30 * paragraphs [0004] , [0019] - [0021]; claim - *; | [PX] - DECSI TAMÁS ET AL, "Effect of N-3 polyunsaturated fatty acid supplementation in pregnancy: the Nuheal trial.", ADVANCES IN EXPERIMENTAL MEDICINE AND BIOLOGY. 2005, (2005), vol. 569, ISSN 0065-2598, pages 109 - 113, XP009069596 [PX] 1-45 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/1-4020-3535-7_15 |