EP1868662 - DRUG RELEASE REGIONS WITH POLYCYCLIC-STRUCTURE-CONTAINING POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited PO Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church / BB | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RANADE, Shrirang V. 35 Russell Place Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | 02 /
HELMUS, Michael N. 2 Jamesbury Drive Worcester, Massachusetts 01609 / US | 03 /
RICHARD, Robert E. 2570 West Street Wrentham, Massachusetts 02093 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Vossius & Partner, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/33] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Jungblut, Bernhard Jakob, et al JUNGBLUT & SEUSS Patentanwälte Max-Dohrn-Strasse 10 10589 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 06738195.4 | 14.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US09111 | Priority number, date | US20050079621 | 14.03.2005 Original published format: US 79621 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006099409 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868662 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868662 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/50, A61L27/54, A61L29/14, A61L29/16, A61L31/14, A61L31/16 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61L27/50 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/14 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/602 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSBEREICHE MIT POLYMEREN MIT POLYZYKLISCHER STRUKTUR | [2007/52] | English: | DRUG RELEASE REGIONS WITH POLYCYCLIC-STRUCTURE-CONTAINING POLYMERS | [2007/52] | French: | REGIONS DE LIBERATION MEDICAMENTEUSE DESTINEES A DES DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX ET COMPRENANT DES POLYMERES PRESENTANT UNE STRUCTURE POLYCYCLIQUE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 01.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.05.2010 | BE | 26.05.2010 | CY | 26.05.2010 | CZ | 26.05.2010 | DK | 26.05.2010 | EE | 26.05.2010 | FI | 26.05.2010 | HU | 26.05.2010 | LT | 26.05.2010 | LV | 26.05.2010 | PL | 26.05.2010 | RO | 26.05.2010 | SE | 26.05.2010 | SI | 26.05.2010 | SK | 26.05.2010 | TR | 26.05.2010 | BG | 26.08.2010 | GR | 27.08.2010 | IS | 26.09.2010 | PT | 27.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
TR | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
BG | 26.08.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
BE | 26.05.2010 | ||
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
RO | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
SK | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
DK | 26.05.2010 | ||
EE | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
PT | 27.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
CY | 26.05.2010 | ||
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 26.05.2010 | |
FI | 26.05.2010 | ||
LT | 26.05.2010 | ||
LV | 26.05.2010 | ||
PL | 26.05.2010 | ||
SE | 26.05.2010 | ||
SI | 26.05.2010 | ||
GR | 27.08.2010 | ||
IS | 26.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0216463 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [A]WO2004000267 (SCIMED LIFE SYTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [A]WO2005011769 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-32 * claim - *; | [T] - BUDD, P.M.; MCKEOWN, N.B.; FRITSCH D, "Free volume and intrinsic microporosity in polymers", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 15, pages 1977 - 1986, XP002413372 [T] 1-32 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b417402j |