EP1863708 - POLY-STRETCH BAGGER SYSTEM WITH HOCKING PUSHER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLY-CLIP SYSTEM CORP. 1000 Tower Road Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VESELOVSKY, Oleg 636 Clearview Drive Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
PINTO, Robert 7315 West Palatine Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US | 03 /
HASCHKE, Eggo L. 1799 We-Go Trail Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | 04 /
KIRK, Edward D. West 64 Circle Drive Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | [2008/15] |
Former [2007/50] | 01 /
KIRK, Edward, D. 636 Clearview Drive Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | ||
02 /
HASCHKE, Eggo, L. 7315 West Palatine Chicago, Illinois 60631 / US | |||
03 /
PINTO, Robert 1799 We-Go Trail Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | |||
04 /
VESELOVSKY, Oleg West 64 Circle Drive Mundelein, Illinois 60060 / US | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2008/33] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | Hackett, Sean James Marks & Clerk, Patent Attorneys, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham B1 1TT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06738392.7 | 15.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US09327 | Priority number, date | US20050080869 | 15.03.2005 Original published format: US 80869 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006099488 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1863708 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863708 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65B5/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
B65B5/045 (EP,US);
B65B25/064 (EP,US);
B65B43/28 (EP,US);
B65B43/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | MEHRFACHDEHNABPACKSYSTEM MIT HOCKSCHIEBER | [2007/50] | English: | POLY-STRETCH BAGGER SYSTEM WITH HOCKING PUSHER | [2007/50] | French: | SYSTEME D'ENSACHEUR POLY-EXTENSIBLE PRESENTANT UN POUSSOIR D'ENFILEMENT | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 12.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 16.03.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.03.2006 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | LV | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
LV | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4352263 (ANDREWS JR H DAVID) [A] 1-5* figures 6-8 *; | [YA]EP0065802 (VULCAAN ADMIN & AUTOM BV [NL]) [Y] 1,5 * page 4, lines 8-19 * * page 7, lines 7-36; figure - * [A] 2-4; | [A]US5782056 (MAY DENNIS J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 9, lines 10-52; figures 7-20 *; | [YA]WO02057139 (POLY CLIP SYSTEM CORP [US]) [Y] 1,5 * the whole document * [A] 2-4 | International search | [A]US3254472 (CLARK KENNETH G, et al); | [A]US4069643 (YOUNG WILLIAM E, et al); | [A]US4464882 (VAN GINKEL MANNES [NL], et al); | [A]US5209043 (KUPCIKEVICIUS VYTAUTAS [US]); | [A]US5435114 (MOEHLENBROCK ANDREW W [US], et al) | by applicant | US4293977 | EP0065802 | US5279519 | WO02057139 |