EP1866156 - SOUND REDUCING WEDGE SHAPED POLYMER INTERLAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2017 [2017/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solutia Inc. 575 Maryville Centre Drive St. Louis, Missouri 63141 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Jun 46 Oak Brook Drive East Longmeadow, Massachusetts 01028 / US | 02 /
DAER, Brian 19680 Fort Street, 203 Riverview, Michigan 48192 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Beckmann, Claus Kraus & Weisert Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06738539.3 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US09489 | Priority number, date | US20050081947 | 17.03.2005 Original published format: US 81947 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101960 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866156 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, B32B27/30, B60J1/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B60J1/00 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10568 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/22 (EP,US);
B32B27/30 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/42 (EP,US);
G02B27/01 (EP,US);
B32B2250/02 (EP,US);
B32B2250/24 (EP,US);
B32B2307/102 (EP,US);
B32B2605/006 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24777 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2495 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3163 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31942 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄUSCHMINDERNDE, KEILFÖRMIGE POLYMERZWISCHENLAGEN | [2007/51] | English: | SOUND REDUCING WEDGE SHAPED POLYMER INTERLAYERS | [2007/51] | French: | INTERCOUCHES POLYMERES CUNEIFORMES DE REDUCTION SONORE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 20.08.2009 | Observations by third parties | 23.11.2009 | Observations by third parties | 28.10.2010 | Observations by third parties | 07.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2014 | Observations by third parties | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2014 | Observations by third parties | 19.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/31] | 28.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5639538 (WONG BERT CARL [US]); | [X]EP1063205 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | US5340654 | EP0710545 | other | JPH02229742 | WO9106031 | US5013134 | JPH05330864 | WO9400787 | JPH06926 | US5340654 | EP0710545 | JPH10338556 | WO0143963 | US2002172804 | EP1281690 | JP2004075501 |