EP1859343 - LOW POWER ARRAY MULTIPLIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISLAM, Farhad, Fuad 205 Sherwood Forest Place Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06738733.2 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006US09706 | Priority number, date | US20050083698 | 17.03.2005 Original published format: US 83698 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006102076 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859343 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859343 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
G06F7/5312 (EP,US);
G06F7/52 (KR);
G06F7/53 (KR);
G06F2207/382 (EP,US);
G06F2207/3868 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWACHSTROM-MATRIXMULTIPLIZIERER | [2007/48] | English: | LOW POWER ARRAY MULTIPLIER | [2007/48] | French: | MULTIPLICATEUR DE MATRICE FAIBLE PUISSANCE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.2009 | BE | 04.11.2009 | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | LV | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | IE | 17.03.2010 | LU | 17.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
LU | 17.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
IE | 17.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
CY | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002032713 (JOU SHYH-JYE [TW], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0071]; figure 8 *; | [A]US2003120695 (WILLSON ALAN N [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [A] - MUHAMMAD K ET AL, "Switching characteristics of generalized array multiplier architectures and their applications to low power design", COMPUTER DESIGN, 1999. (ICCD '99). INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUSTIN, TX, USA 10-13 OCT. 1999, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19991010), ISBN 0-7695-0406-X, pages 230 - 235, XP010360513 [A] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCD.1999.808430 | [A] - OHBAN J ET AL, "Multiplier energy reduction through bypassing of partial products", CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, 2002. APCCAS '02. 2002 ASIA-PACIFIC CONFERENCE ON OCT. 28-31, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021028), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-7690-0, pages 13 - 17, XP010620774 [A] 1-20 * section 2.1 * | [A] - MALLIOS N ET AL INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "The quiet state- a new approach to low-power multiplier design", CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 37TH. ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS, & COMPUTERS. PACIFIC GROOVE, CA, NOV. 9 - 12, 2003, ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20031109), VOL. 1 OF 2. CONF. 37, ISBN 0-7803-8104-1, pages 2222 - 2226, XP010701328 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2003.1292375 | [A] - SUHWAN KIM ET AL, "Reconfigurable low energy multiplier for multimedia system design", PROCEEDINGS OF IEEE ANNUAL WORKSHOP ON VLSI, (20000427), pages 129 - 134, XP010379678 [A] 1-20 * abstract * |