EP1863792 - ATP COMPETITIVE KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton NJ 05843-4000 / US | ||
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAVAI, Ashvinikumar V. 12 Stonewall Drive Princeton Junction, New Jersey 08550 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Ping 21 Derby Chase Court Belle Mead, New Jersey 08502 / US | 03 /
ZHAO, Yufen 83 Chicory Lane Pennington, New Jersey 08534 / US | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Hart Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06739676.2 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US11023 | Priority number, date | US20050665826P | 28.03.2005 Original published format: US 665826 P | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006104971 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1863792 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863792 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D471/04, C07D401/14, A61K31/495, A61P35/00, A61P19/02 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMPETITIVE ATP-KINASEHEMMER | [2007/50] | English: | ATP COMPETITIVE KINASE INHIBITORS | [2007/50] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE KINASE EXERCANT UNE ACTION ANTIPROLIFERATIVE | [2007/50] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 24.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.01.2009 | BE | 21.01.2009 | CY | 21.01.2009 | CZ | 21.01.2009 | DK | 21.01.2009 | EE | 21.01.2009 | FI | 21.01.2009 | LT | 21.01.2009 | LV | 21.01.2009 | NL | 21.01.2009 | PL | 21.01.2009 | RO | 21.01.2009 | SI | 21.01.2009 | SK | 21.01.2009 | TR | 21.01.2009 | IE | 27.03.2009 | LU | 27.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 21.04.2009 | SE | 21.04.2009 | GR | 22.04.2009 | IS | 21.05.2009 | PT | 22.06.2009 | HU | 22.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
LT | 21.01.2009 | ||
LV | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
PL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.03.2009 | ||
LU | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IS | 21.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
HU | 22.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
LT | 21.01.2009 | ||
LV | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
PL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.03.2009 | ||
LU | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IS | 21.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
LT | 21.01.2009 | ||
LV | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
PL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
GR | 22.04.2009 | ||
IS | 21.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
LT | 21.01.2009 | ||
LV | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
PL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 21.04.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
IS | 21.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
LT | 21.01.2009 | ||
LV | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
PL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
IE | 27.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
IS | 21.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 21.01.2009 | |
BE | 21.01.2009 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2009 | ||
DK | 21.01.2009 | ||
EE | 21.01.2009 | ||
FI | 21.01.2009 | ||
LT | 21.01.2009 | ||
LV | 21.01.2009 | ||
NL | 21.01.2009 | ||
PL | 21.01.2009 | ||
RO | 21.01.2009 | ||
SI | 21.01.2009 | ||
SK | 21.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 21.04.2009 | ||
IS | 21.05.2009 | ||
PT | 22.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | NL | 21.01.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0882717 (KYOWA HAKKO KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-19 * pages 1-2; example 103 *; | [A]WO0121597 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * pages 1-2; example 11 *; | [A]WO03042172 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * pages 1-2; example 66 *; | [A]WO2004113324 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-19 * pages 1-2; tables 1,2 *; | [E]WO2006069395 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al) [E] 1-19* pages 1-2; compound 78B * | by applicant | US10146P | WO03042172 | US2003186983 | US2004044203 | WO2005066176 | US2005182058 | US2005197339 | WO2006069365 | - SCHLESSINGER J., "Cell signaling by receptor tyrosine kinases", CELL, (2000), vol. 103, no. 2, pages 211 - 225 | - COBLEIGH, M. A. ET AL., "Multinational study of the efficacy and safety of humanized anti-HER2 monoclonal antibody in women who have HER2-overexpressing metastatic breast cancer that has progressed after chemotherapy for metastatic disease", J. OF CLIN. ONCOL., (1999), vol. 17, no. 9, pages 2639 - 2648 | - BASELGA, J. ET AL., "Phase I studies of anti-epidermal growth factor receptor chimeric antibody C225 alone and in combination with cisplatin", J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2000), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 904 - 914 | - SATOH, K. ET AL., "Involvement of ErbB-2 in rheumatoid synovial cell growth", ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (2001), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 260 - 265 |