EP1874215 - INTERNAL BIOPSY MARKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytyc Corporation 250 Campus Drive The Campus at Marlborough Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | For all designated states Cytyc Corporation 250 Campus Drive The Campus at Marborough Marlborough MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTMEL, Robert 116 Bloomfield Road Burlingame, California 94010 / US | 02 /
SAMPSON, Russel, M. 449 Ferne Avenue Palo Alto, California 94306 / US | 03 /
SHEETS, Ellen 257 Nashoba Road Concord, Massachusetts 01742 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Tombling, Adrian George, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 06740129.9 | 29.03.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US11790 | Priority number, date | US20050667390P | 31.03.2005 Original published format: US 667390 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006105353 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874215 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00, A61B1/018, A61B17/00, A61B1/07 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
A61B1/313 (EP,US);
A61B1/018 (EP,US);
A61B90/39 (EP,US);
A61B1/00154 (EP,US);
A61B1/07 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00796 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTERNE BIOPSIEMARKIERUNG | [2008/02] | English: | INTERNAL BIOPSY MARKING | [2008/02] | French: | MARQUAGE DE BIOPSIE INTERNE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 17.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005049489 (FOERSTER SETH A [US], et al) [X] 6-9,14,15,18,24-29,35 * figures 4,12,16,18,20 * * paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0020] , [0022] , [0024] , [0025] , [0052] , [0053] , [0059] - [0061] - [0068] , [0072] , [0076] - [0078] * [Y] 10-13,16-23,27,30,31; | [X]US2003199726 (GATTO DOMINICK L [US]) [X] 6-8,24,35 * figures 1,3,4,8 * * paragraphs [0020] , [0024] , [0048] - [0050] - [0060] *; | [Y]WO02053036 (SENORX INC [US]) [Y] 10,11 * figures 4B,4C * * page 3, line 11 - line 13 * * page 46, line 15 - line 22 *; | [Y]US2004097981 (SELIS JAMES E [US]) [Y] 12,13,16,17 * figures 4-6,16 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0038] , [0060] , [0062] , [0082] , [0090] *; | [Y]US2005063908 (BURBANK FRED H [US], et al) [Y] 18-21 * figures 2,7,10 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0022] , [0023] , [0028] , [0073] , [0078] *; | [Y]EP1163888 (INRAD INC [US]) [Y] 19-21 * figures 14,15 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0045] *; | [Y]US2005033157 (KLEIN DEAN A [US], et al) [Y] 22,23 * paragraphs [0034] , [0051] *; | [Y]WO9729709 (BIOSENSE INC [US], et al) [Y] 27 * figure 2 * * page 15, line 15 - line 20 *; | [Y]US6056700 (BURNEY BRYAN T [US], et al) [Y] 30,31 * figure 17 * * column 7, line 22 - line 24 *; | [A]US2003192557 (KRAG DAVID [US], et al) [A] 8-23 * figures 24-33 * * paragraphs [0152] , [0157] , [0158] * |