EP1868680 - APPARATUS FOR DETECTING POSITION AND MIGRATION OF NEUROSTIMULATION LEADS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/52] | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING POSITION AND MIGRATION OF NEUROSTIMULATION LEADS | ||
[2018/20] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Advanced Bionics Corporation 25129 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRADLEY, Kerry 3081 Menlo Drive Glendale, California 91208 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2018/52] |
Former [2008/32] | Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/52] | Dennemeyer, John James, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Patents-trademarks-Designs P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 06740372.5 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US12258 | Priority number, date | US20050096662 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: US 96662 | US20050096483 | 01.04.2005 Original published format: US 96483 | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006107848 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868680 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868680 | Date: | 26.12.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/08 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61N1/3614 (EP,US);
A61N1/36185 (EP,US);
A61N1/37241 (US);
A61N1/0551 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/52] |
Former [2007/52] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER POSITION UND DER MIGRATION VON NEUROSTIMULATIONSLEITUNGEN | [2018/20] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DETECTING POSITION AND MIGRATION OF NEUROSTIMULATION LEADS | [2018/20] | French: | APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE L'EMPLACEMENT ET DE LA MIGRATION DE CONDUCTEURS DE NEUROSTIMULATION | [2018/20] |
Former [2007/52] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DER POSITION UND DER MIGRATION VON NEUROSTIMULATIONSLEITUNGEN | ||
Former [2007/52] | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING POSITION AND MIGRATION OF NEUROSTIMULATION LEADS | ||
Former [2007/52] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDES DE DETECTION DE L'EMPLACEMENT ET DE LA MIGRATION DE CONDUCTEURS DE NEUROSTIMULATION | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.02.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2006 | AT | 26.12.2018 | CY | 26.12.2018 | CZ | 26.12.2018 | DK | 26.12.2018 | EE | 26.12.2018 | ES | 26.12.2018 | FI | 26.12.2018 | IT | 26.12.2018 | LT | 26.12.2018 | LV | 26.12.2018 | MC | 26.12.2018 | PL | 26.12.2018 | RO | 26.12.2018 | SE | 26.12.2018 | SI | 26.12.2018 | SK | 26.12.2018 | TR | 26.12.2018 | BG | 26.03.2019 | GR | 27.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | FR | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | LU | 31.03.2019 | IS | 26.04.2019 | PT | 26.04.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CY | 26.12.2018 | ||
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
TR | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SI | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
FR | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
LU | 31.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
DK | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 26.12.2018 | |
CZ | 26.12.2018 | ||
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
MC | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
SK | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
IS | 26.04.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
EE | 26.12.2018 | ||
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
RO | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | CZ | 26.12.2018 | |
ES | 26.12.2018 | ||
FI | 26.12.2018 | ||
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
PL | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
IT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
PT | 26.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
LV | 26.12.2018 | ||
SE | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
GR | 27.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
BG | 26.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 26.12.2018 | |
LT | 26.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 26.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2003139781 (BRADLEY KERRY [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-43 * paragraphs [0040] - [0073]; figure - *; | [A]US6516227 (MEADOWS PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-5,7-43 * column 20, line 5, paragraph 44; figure - * | Examination | US2004064161 | by applicant | US6516227 |