EP1868645 - MULTIVALENT PNEUMOCOCCAL POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.05.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wyeth LLC 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017-5755 / US | [2014/10] |
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states Wyeth LLC Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | ||
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Wyeth Five Giralda Farms Madison, NJ 07940 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAUSDORFF, William, P. Avenue De La Chapelle, 19 B-1200 Woluwe Saint-lambert / BE | 02 /
SIBER, George, Rainer 160 West 66th Street New York, NY 10023 / US | 03 /
PARADISO, Peter, R. 445 Freedom View Lane Valley Forge, PA 19481 / US | [2007/52] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2012/32] |
Former [2012/10] | Ricol, David Gerard Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25, avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | ||
Former [2010/17] | Ricol, David Gerard Pfizer Limited European Patent Department Ramsgate Road Sandwich, Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/52] | Denholm, Anna Marie Wyeth Pharmaceuticals, Huntercombe Lane South Taplow, Maidenhead Berkshire SL6 0PH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06740419.4 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/52] | WO2006US12354 | Priority number, date | US20050669605P | 08.04.2005 Original published format: US 669605 P | [2007/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006110381 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1868645 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868645 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K39/09, A61K39/295, A61K39/02 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/092 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P25/00 (EP,IL);
A61P27/16 (EP,IL);
A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P31/04 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2039/6031 (IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/52] | Extension states | AL | 11.10.2007 | BA | 11.10.2007 | HR | 11.10.2007 | MK | 11.10.2007 | YU | 11.10.2007 | Title | German: | MULTIVALENTE PNEUMOKOKKEN-POLYSACCHARIDPROTEINKONJUGATZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2007/52] | English: | MULTIVALENT PNEUMOCOCCAL POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEIN CONJUGATE COMPOSITION | [2007/52] | French: | COMPOSITION CONJUGUEE POLYSACCHARIDE-PROTEINE PNEUMOCOCCIQUE POLYVALENTE | [2007/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 19.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11188651.1 / EP2425851 | EP11188654.5 / EP2425852 | EP11188659.4 / EP2425853 | EP11188668.5 / EP2425854 | EP11188674.3 / EP2425855 | EP11188679.2 / EP2425856 | EP17196004.0 / EP3311836 | EP21211242.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2012
07.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Merck & Co. 126 East Lincoln Avenue, Mail Stop: RY60-30 Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 02
06.12.2012
11.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | 03
06.12.2012
17.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer, Franz-Josef Savitsstr. 18 81929 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | 04
07.12.2012
17.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Crucell Holland B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL Opponent's representative Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 05
07.12.2012
18.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2012
07.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Merck & Co. 126 East Lincoln Avenue, Mail Stop: RY60-30 Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
02
06.12.2012
11.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
03
06.12.2012
17.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer, Franz-Josef Savitsstr. 18 81929 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
04
07.12.2012
17.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Crucell Holland B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL Opponent's representative Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
05
07.12.2012
18.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2016/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2012
07.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Merck & Co. 126 East Lincoln Avenue, Mail Stop: RY60-30 Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
02
06.12.2012
11.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Strawman Limited Orchard Lea Horns Lane Combe, Witney Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | |||
03
06.12.2012
17.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Zimmer, Franz-Josef Savitsstr. 18 81929 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB, et al, et al Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | |||
04
07.12.2012
17.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Crucell Holland B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL Opponent's representative Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
05
07.12.2012
18.01.2013
ADMISSIBLE Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2013/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2012
07.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Merck & Co. 126 East Lincoln Avenue, Mail Stop: RY60-30 Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | ||
02
06.12.2012
11.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE STRAWMAN LIMITED 34 Lovedon Lane Winchester Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB Opponent's representative Vossius & Partner, et al, et al Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | |||
03
06.12.2012
Zimmer, Franz-Josef Savitsstr. 18 81929 München / DE Opponent's representative Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser, et al, et al Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | |||
04
07.12.2012
Crucell Holland B.V. Archimedesweg 4 2333 CN Leiden / NL Opponent's representative Chapman, Desmond Mark, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
05
07.12.2012
Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Via Fiorentina 1 53100 Siena (SI) / IT Opponent's representative Marshall, Cameron John, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | |||
Former [2013/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.12.2012
Merck & Co. 126 East Lincoln Avenue, Mail Stop: RY60-30 Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George, et al, et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 23.01.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.08.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 27.09.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/26] | Appeal following opposition | 03.02.2015 | Appeal received No. T0243/15 | 04.05.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.03.2016 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [2016/10] | 13.09.2016 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2016/38] | 26.09.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | 26.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.10.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.11.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2012/47] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0497525 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [X]US2001048929 (CHONG PELE [CA], et al); | [A]WO2004011027 (BAXTER INT [US], et al); | by applicant | EP0497525 | US2001048929 | WO2004011027 |