EP1866482 - INFLATABLE ACTUATOR FOR A DOCK LEVELER DECK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rite-Hite Holding Corporation 8900 North Arbon Drive Milwaukee, WI 53223-2451 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUHL, Tim 1132 Nordic Lane Slinger, Wisconsin 53086 / US | 02 /
WANIE, Andrew W208 N16581 Celtic Court Jackson, Wisconsin 53037 / US | 03 /
HAHN, Norbert 6869 South Tumblecreek Drive Franklin, Wisconsin 53132 / US | 04 /
PETRI, Mark G. 9822 N. Valley Hill Drive Mequon, Wisconsin 53092 / US | 05 /
PIETRANGELO, Pamela 621 E. Deer Ridge Pass Oak Creek, WI 53154 / US | 06 /
SANDER, Reinhard E. 3309 N. Knoll Terrace Wauwatosa, WI 53222 / US | 07 /
SCHWAGER, Jeffrey R. 3901 W. Gazebo Hill Mequon, WI 53092 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstrasse 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | von Samson-Himmelstjerna, Friedrich, et al SAMSON & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06740588.6 | 04.04.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US12742 | Priority number, date | US20050099151 | 05.04.2005 Original published format: US 99151 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006108072 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1866482 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866482 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01D1/00, B65G69/28 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
B65G69/2817 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | E01D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARER AKTUATOR FÜR EIN LADEBRÜCKENDECK | [2007/51] | English: | INFLATABLE ACTUATOR FOR A DOCK LEVELER DECK | [2007/51] | French: | ACTIONNEUR GONFLABLE POUR PLATE-FORME DE NIVELEUR DE QUAI | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 26.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11004599.4 / EP2374938 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.04.2006 | AT | 13.07.2011 | BE | 13.07.2011 | CY | 13.07.2011 | CZ | 13.07.2011 | DK | 13.07.2011 | EE | 13.07.2011 | FI | 13.07.2011 | IT | 13.07.2011 | LT | 13.07.2011 | LV | 13.07.2011 | PL | 13.07.2011 | RO | 13.07.2011 | SE | 13.07.2011 | SI | 13.07.2011 | SK | 13.07.2011 | TR | 13.07.2011 | BG | 13.10.2011 | GR | 14.10.2011 | ES | 24.10.2011 | IS | 13.11.2011 | PT | 14.11.2011 | IE | 04.04.2012 | LU | 04.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2012 | ||
LU | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
TR | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.10.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
ES | 24.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
IE | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
DK | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
EE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
IT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
RO | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
SK | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
CY | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.07.2011 | |
BE | 13.07.2011 | ||
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
LV | 13.07.2011 | ||
PL | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
SI | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
SE | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.10.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 13.07.2011 | |
FI | 13.07.2011 | ||
LT | 13.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.11.2011 | ||
PT | 14.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 13.07.2011 | |
IS | 13.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3407496 (SIEMAG TRANSPLAN GMBH [DE]) [X] 15,17,18 * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 60 ** figures 1-3 *; | [XY]US5802651 (MASSEY DOUGLAS H [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,15,21 * column 3, line 30 - column 7, line 40 * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 16; | [XY]US2003204921 (BENDER BRIAN [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 3, paragraph 55 * * page 4, paragraph 60 - paragraph 61 * * figures 1-18 * [Y] 16 | International search | [X]US5802651 (MASSEY DOUGLAS H [US], et al); | [Y]US6286812 (CHERRY CHARLES W [US]); | [X]US2004221404 (BENDER BRIAN [US], et al) |