EP1872605 - RE-ACQUIRING SIGNALS OF A WIRELESS BROADCAST NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANTRAVADI, Ashok 7855 Avenida Navidad, 229 San Diego, California 92122 / US | 02 /
RADHAKRISHNAN, Dhinakar 10855 Charbono Point San Diego, California 92131 / US | 03 /
CHARI, Murali Ramaswamy 11723 Springside Road San Diego, California 92128 / US | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/01] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06740615.7 | 07.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006US12826 | Priority number, date | US20050669554P | 07.04.2005 Original published format: US 669554 P | [2008/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006110445 | Date: | 19.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1872605 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1872605 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/06, H04L12/18 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
H04H20/12 (EP,US);
H04L12/18 (KR);
H04B1/06 (KR);
H04H20/71 (EP,US);
H04H40/18 (EP,US);
H04L1/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2008/01] | H04Q7/22, H04L12/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUERFASSUNG VON SIGNALEN EINES DRAHTLOSEN AUSSTRAHLUNGSNETZWERKS | [2008/01] | English: | RE-ACQUIRING SIGNALS OF A WIRELESS BROADCAST NETWORK | [2008/01] | French: | REACQUISITION DE SIGNAUX D'UN RESEAU DE RADIODIFFUSION SANS FIL | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 04.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 08.04.2008 | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | HU | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/45] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
HU | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0215611 (VESUVIUS INC [US]) [A] 1-42 * page 41, line 1 - page 44, line 26; figure 8 ** page 17, line 8 - line 28; figure 9 *; | [YA]US2002141447 (LEUNG NIKOLAI K N [US], et al) [Y] 19,20,24,35,36,38 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0065]; figures 2,6 * * paragraph [0122] * [A] 21-27,37,39,40; | [XAY]US2004100937 (CHEN TAO [US]) [X] 1,6-14,28,30-34,41,42 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0051]; figure 5 * * paragraph [0059]; figure 7 * * paragraph [0063] * [A] 15-18 [Y] 2-5,19,20,24,29,35,36,38; | [Y]WO2005022811 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [Y] 2-5,29 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0042] * |