EP1874724 - PHENYL ETHYNE COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSFORD, Nicholas, D. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
SEIDERS, Thomas, J. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2008/02] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Herts. EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06740961.5 | 18.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US14517 | Priority number, date | US20050674234P | 22.04.2005 Original published format: US 674234 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006115895 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874724 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/50, C07D239/08, C07D213/62, A61K31/275, A61K31/435, A61K31/505 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07C255/50 (EP,US);
A01N37/34 (EP,US);
A01N43/40 (EP,US);
A01N43/54 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07C255/51 (EP,US);
C07C255/53 (EP,US);
C07C255/58 (EP,US);
C07D213/65 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHENYLETHINVERBINDUNGEN | [2008/02] | English: | PHENYL ETHYNE COMPOUNDS | [2008/02] | French: | COMPOSES DE PHENYLETHYNE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 12.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5618787 (JAMISON JAMES A [US], et al); | [X]WO2004078728 (ADDEX PHARMACEUTICALS SA [CH], et al) |