EP1924170 - DRIVE FOR A MOBILE FURNITURE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Edgar Eicheleweg 9 6971 Hard / AT | [2011/27] |
Former [2008/22] | 01 /
HUBER, Edgar Eicheleweg 9 A-6971 Hard / AT | Representative(s) | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Hofinger, Stephan, et al Wilhelm-Greilstrasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 06741051.4 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006AT00256 | Priority number, date | AT20050001221 | 20.07.2005 Original published format: AT 12212005 | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009133 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1924170 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1924170 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
A47B88/457 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/216 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/246 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/462 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/3015 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Title | German: | ANTRIEB FÜR EIN BEWEGBARES MÖBELTEIL | [2008/22] | English: | DRIVE FOR A MOBILE FURNITURE PART | [2008/22] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT POUR UNE PARTIE DE MEUBLE MOBILE | [2011/27] |
Former [2008/22] | SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR UNE PARTIE DE MEUBLE MOBILE | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 24.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2006 | CY | 21.09.2011 | CZ | 21.09.2011 | DK | 21.09.2011 | EE | 21.09.2011 | FI | 21.09.2011 | IE | 21.09.2011 | LT | 21.09.2011 | LV | 21.09.2011 | NL | 21.09.2011 | PL | 21.09.2011 | RO | 21.09.2011 | SE | 21.09.2011 | SI | 21.09.2011 | SK | 21.09.2011 | BG | 21.12.2011 | GR | 22.12.2011 | ES | 01.01.2012 | IS | 21.01.2012 | PT | 23.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
BG | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
ES | 01.01.2012 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
DK | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
PL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
EE | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
NL | 21.09.2011 | ||
RO | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
SK | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
PT | 23.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
CZ | 21.09.2011 | ||
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
IS | 21.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
IE | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 21.09.2011 | |
FI | 21.09.2011 | ||
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
LV | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
SI | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
SE | 21.09.2011 | ||
GR | 22.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 21.09.2011 | |
LT | 21.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 21.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1323363 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [DX]EP1374732 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]); | [X]WO2004100718 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT], et al) |