Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8026278 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2011 | B2 | US2008311183 | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA00871 | 29.05.2006 | US91566406 | 29.05.2006 | US68497905 | 27.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1891082 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2009 | A4 | EP1891082 | 27.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA00871 | 29.05.2006 | US68497905 | 27.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2610647 | 03.02.2015 | C | CA2610647 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA00871 | 29.05.2006 | US68497905 | 27.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006125323 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US68497905 | 27.05.2005 |