EP1891082 - NOVEL INHIBITORS OF PYRUVATE KINASE AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS FOR CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leyland-Jones, Brian 1455 Sherbrooke Street West, Apt. 411 Montréal, Québec H3B 1L2 / CA | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Brian R. Apartment 7 1175 Baxter Street Lasalle, Québec H8N 2S4 / CA | 02 /
CHAN, Tak-Hang Suite 302 1140 Pierce Street Montréal, Québec H3H 2K2 / CA | 03 /
LEYLAND-JONES, Brian 1455 Sherbrooke Street West, Apt. 411 Montréal, Québec H3B 1L2 / CA | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechsanwälte Steinerstraße 15/Haus A 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/09] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Melchiorstrasse 42 D-81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06741580.2 | 29.05.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006CA00871 | Priority number, date | US20050684979P | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 684979 P | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006125323 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1891082 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07F15/00, A61K31/661, A61K31/282, A61K31/6615, A61K31/662, A61K31/695, A61K45/06, A61P35/00, C07C305/04, C07F7/02, C07F7/08, C07F7/18, C07F9/08, C07F9/09, C07F9/141, C07F9/28, C07F9/40 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C07C305/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/282 (EP,US);
A61K31/661 (EP,US);
A61K31/6615 (EP,US);
A61K31/662 (EP,US);
A61K31/695 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE INHIBITOREN VON PYRUVATKINASE ALS THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL GEGEN KREBS | [2008/09] | English: | NOVEL INHIBITORS OF PYRUVATE KINASE AS THERAPEUTIC AGENTS FOR CANCER | [2008/09] | French: | NOUVEAUX INHIBITEURS DE LA PYRUVATE KINASE COMME AGENTS THERAPEUTIQUES ANTICANCEREUX | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 29.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9948490 (ALLOS THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, line 14 - line 18 * * page 4, line 7 - line 8 * * table 1 * * abstract * | [X] - LI, YAW KUEN ET AL, "Alkylation of glyceraldehyde-3-phosphate dehydrogenase with haloacetylphosphonates. An unusual pH-dependence", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL , 275(3), 767-72 CODEN: BIJOAK; ISSN: 0306-3275, (1991), XP002496790 [X] 1,2,12-19 * abstract * * Introduction * | International search | [X]US2956919 (BAKER JOSEPH W, et al); | [X]US2719167 (PAUL SCHMIDT); | [Y]US2004009981 (BEBBINGTON DAVID [GB], et al); | [Y]US2004198750 (GREEN JEREMY [US], et al) | [X] - GUREVICH I.E. ET AL, "Dimethyl-3-chloroprop-1-en-2-ylphosphonate. Part 3. Alkylation of anionic O and C nucleophiles and preparation of 1-alkenyl-2-phosphonates", PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR AND SILICON AND RELATED ELEMENTS, (1999), vol. 148, pages 61 - 78, XP008075139 | [X] - CSUK R. ET AL, "Allylphosphonates by heteroanalogous zinc-silver/graphite mediated Dreiding-Schmidt reactions", JOURNAL OF CARBOHYDRATE CHEMISTRY, (1999), vol. 18, no. 3, pages 285 - 295, XP008075142 | [X] - KRAWCZYK H., "A convenient route to monodealkylation of diethyl phosphonates", SYNTHETIC COMMUNICATIONS, (1997), vol. 27, no. 18, pages 3151 - 3161, XP008075143 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/00397919708004173 | [X] - KNOCHEL P. ET AL., "Synthese de dienes-1,4-fonctionnalises par addition de zinciques allyliques fonctionnalises sur des alcynes vrais et leur cyclisation en heterocycles ou carbocycles", J. ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 309, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 23, XP003005332 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(00)99569-X | [X] - BRITTELLI D.R., "A study of the reaction of 2-haloacyl halides with trialkyl phosphites. Synthesis of (2-substituted acyl) phosphonates", J. ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 50, no. 11, pages 1845 - 1847, XP003005333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00211a011 | [X] - KNOCHEL P. ET AL., "Addition of functionalized allylic bromides to terminal alkynes", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1984), vol. 25, no. 14, pages 1475 - 1478, XP003005334 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)80190-8 |