EP1893916 - BAR LIGHTER COMPRISING A SAFETY MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PI-DESIGN AG Kantonstrasse 100, Postfach 463 6234 Triengen / CH | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Peter Wenzhou Rifeng LTR Co., LTD Xingyuan road 107, Zhuangyuan Industrial Park Longwan borough, Wenzhou, Zhejiang / CN | [2008/21] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
HUANG, Peter c/o Rifeng Lighter Co., Ltd Zhuang Yuan Industrial District Zehjiang Province / CN | Representative(s) | Detken, Andreas Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Detken, Andreas Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 06741610.7 | 29.05.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006CH00284 | Priority number, date | CH20050001068 | 23.06.2005 Original published format: CH 10682005 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136039 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893916 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F23Q2/16 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
F23Q2/164 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, LI [2008/29] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STABFEUERZEUG MIT SICHERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2008/10] | English: | BAR LIGHTER COMPRISING A SAFETY MECHANISM | [2008/10] | French: | BRIQUET BATON MUNI D'UN DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 23.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 01.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/23] | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/23] | 26.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002061488 (SUNG KIL YONG [US]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0010] , [0026] , [0090] - [0095]; figures 6-9 *; | [Y]US5697775 (SAITO MASAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 10, line 42 - column 11, line 12; figure 1 * * column 12, line 58 - line 62 *; | [A]US6126437 (LIXIANG MAO [CN], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003022120 (LIANG CHUNG-HO [TW]) [A] 2-4,6,7 * paragraph [0016]; figure 5 * |