EP1888889 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF EXHAUST GASES FROM AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states Enerday GmbH Kraillinger Str. 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOLTZE, Matthias Astern Str. 5 17039 Neuendorf / DE | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Schumacher & Willsau Patentanwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 42 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06742398.8 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006DE00957 | Priority number, date | DE20051025455 | 02.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005025455 | [2008/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006128449 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1888889 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
C01B3/386 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F01N3/20 (KR);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N9/00 (KR);
F02D43/00 (KR);
C01B2203/0261 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1685 (EP,US);
C01B2203/169 (EP,US);
F01N2240/30 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
F01N2610/04 (EP,US);
F01N3/0814 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGASEN EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2008/08] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PURIFICATION OF EXHAUST GASES FROM AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2008/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 24.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 05.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2005042934 (HYDROGENSOURCE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,16 * the whole document * [Y] 6,14; | [Y]US2002038542 (AKAMA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6,14 * abstract *; | [X]EP0971102 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-13,15,16 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1,5 *; | [X]EP1484103 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,7-12,15,16 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047]; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH0454926U (UNKNOWN) [X] 1-4,7-12,15,16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10313704 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]JPH1089057 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, & JP10089057 A 19980407 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0013] * | by applicant | DE10233665 |