EP1912966 - 2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE ON THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UCB, S.A. Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENDA, Benoît 41A rue du Hazoir B-5080 Emines / BE | 02 /
QUESNEL, Yannick Venelles des Charmes 9 B-1300 Wavre / BE | 03 /
ATES, Ali 27 rue Profond Baty B-1495 Marbais / BE | 04 /
MICHEL, Philippe 15 Stoofstraat B-1650 Beersel / BE | 05 /
TURET, Laurent Chausée de de Namur 51b B-1320 Hamme-Mille / BE | 06 /
MERCIER, Joël 29 rue Fernand Casimir B-5150 Soye / BE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Hassa, Jürgen UCB Pharma S.A. Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Hassa, Jürgen UCB Pharma S.A. Intellectual Property Department Allée de la Recherche 60 1070 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 06743095.9 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP05199 | Priority number, date | EP20050011780 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05011780 | EP20050011779 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: EP 05011779 | [2008/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006128692 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1912966 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/06, C07D403/06, C07D405/14, C07D417/06, C07D471/04, C07D473/00, A61K31/404, A61K31/4155, A61K31/4178, A61K31/427, A61K31/433, A61K31/435, A61K31/437, A61K31/501, A61K31/5025 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
C07D513/04 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
C07D403/06 (EP,US);
C07D413/06 (EP,US);
C07D417/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | 02.01.2008 | BA | 02.01.2008 | HR | 02.01.2008 | MK | 02.01.2008 | YU | 02.01.2008 | Title | German: | 2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINDERIVATE UND IHREN THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG FUER DAS ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEM | [2008/17] | English: | 2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR THERAPEUTIC USE ON THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM | [2008/17] | French: | DERIVES DE 2-OXO-1-PYRROLIDINE ET LEUR UTILISATION THERAPEUTIQUE SUR LE SYSTEME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2005054188 (UCB SA [BE], et al) [XP] 1-18 * claims 1,20; compounds 91,160,167 *; | [X]WO9324484 (BAYER AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * table 1; compound 9 *; | [Y]WO9307141 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US]) [Y] 1-18 * page 6, line 24 - line 32; claim 1 *; | [X] - REGISTRY, (19841116), XP002398821 [X] 1-3 * column A * | [Y] - THORNBER C W, "ISOSTERISM AND MOLECULAR MODIFICATION IN DRUG DESIGN", CHEMICAL SOCIETY REVIEWS, CHEMICAL SOCIETY, LONDON, GB, (1979), vol. 8, no. 4, ISSN 0306-0012, pages 563 - 580, XP000953019 [Y] 1-18 * page 564; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/cs9790800563 |