EP1865851 - DEVICE FOR SELF-CONTROLLED BREATHING BY A PERSON FOR ASSISTING MONITORING OF A RADIATION THERAPY OR IMAGING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Le Corre, Patrick 12 Rue Clément Ader F-31600 Muret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Le Corre, Patrick 12 Rue Clément Ader F-31600 Muret / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | BARRE LAFORGUE 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Cabinet BARRE LAFORGUE & associés 95, rue des Amidonniers 31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 06743598.2 | 24.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006FR00654 | Priority number, date | FR20050003282 | 04.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0503282 | US20050670282P | 12.04.2005 Original published format: US 670282 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006106202 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865851 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865851 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1865851 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, A61N5/10, A61N5/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
A61N5/1048 (EP,US);
A61N5/1064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SELBSTKONTROLLIERTEN ATMUNG EINER PERSON UND ZUR UNTERSTÜTZUNG DER ÜBERWACHUNG EINER STRAHLENTHERAPIE- ODER ABBILDUNGSEINHEIT | [2007/51] | English: | DEVICE FOR SELF-CONTROLLED BREATHING BY A PERSON FOR ASSISTING MONITORING OF A RADIATION THERAPY OR IMAGING UNIT | [2007/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AUTOCONTRÔLÉ DE SA RESPIRATION PAR UN INDIVIDU EN VUE DE L'ASSISTANCE AU PILOTAGE D'UNE UNITÉ DE RADIOTHÉRAPIE OU D'IMAGERIE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 06.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.08.2010 | CY | 04.08.2010 | CZ | 04.08.2010 | DK | 04.08.2010 | EE | 04.08.2010 | FI | 04.08.2010 | HU | 04.08.2010 | IE | 04.08.2010 | LT | 04.08.2010 | LV | 04.08.2010 | NL | 04.08.2010 | PL | 04.08.2010 | RO | 04.08.2010 | SE | 04.08.2010 | SI | 04.08.2010 | SK | 04.08.2010 | TR | 04.08.2010 | BG | 04.11.2010 | GR | 05.11.2010 | IS | 04.12.2010 | PT | 06.12.2010 | LU | 24.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
TR | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
LU | 24.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
LU | 24.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
RO | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
CZ | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
EE | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
SK | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
DK | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
IE | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
CY | 04.08.2010 | ||
FI | 04.08.2010 | ||
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
LV | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | ||
PL | 04.08.2010 | ||
SE | 04.08.2010 | ||
SI | 04.08.2010 | ||
BG | 04.11.2010 | ||
GR | 05.11.2010 | ||
IS | 04.12.2010 | ||
PT | 06.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 04.08.2010 | |
LT | 04.08.2010 | ||
NL | 04.08.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5949080 (UEDA HISAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2823679 (DYN R [FR]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US6597939 (LAMPOTANG SAMSUN [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 16 - column 7, line 67; claims 1,2 *; | [A]US6633775 (BERNARD PHILIP A [US]) [A] 1-13* claim 1 * |