EP1874720 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ACRYLIC ACID FROM GLYCEROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBOIS, Jean-Luc 190, rue du Coteau F-69390 Millery / FR | 02 /
DUQUENNE, Christophe 8, rue d'Ailly F-80250 Chaussoy-Epagny / FR | 03 /
HÖLDERICH, Wolfgang Mannheimer Strasse 18 67227 Frankenthal / DE | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/02] | Bonnel, Claudine ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06743726.9 | 24.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006FR00907 | Priority number, date | FR20050004111 | 25.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0504111 | FR20060000183 | 10.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0600183 | US20050689423P | 10.06.2005 Original published format: US 689423 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006114506 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1874720 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1874720 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/235, C07C57/04 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07C51/235 (EP,KR,US);
B01J27/053 (KR);
B01J27/185 (KR);
B01J27/187 (KR);
B01J27/188 (KR);
B01J27/199 (KR);
C07C45/52 (EP,US);
C07C51/252 (EP,US);
C07C57/04 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C45/52, C07C47/22 (US,EP);
C07C51/235, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/252, C07C57/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ACRYLSÄURE AUS GLYCEROL | [2008/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ACRYLIC ACID FROM GLYCEROL | [2008/02] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDE ACRYLIQUE A PARTIR DE GLYCEROL | [2013/04] |
Former [2008/02] | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D ACIDE ACRYLIQUE A PARTIR DE GLYCEROL | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2006 | AT | 06.03.2013 | CY | 06.03.2013 | DK | 06.03.2013 | EE | 06.03.2013 | FI | 06.03.2013 | LT | 06.03.2013 | LV | 06.03.2013 | MC | 06.03.2013 | PL | 06.03.2013 | RO | 06.03.2013 | SE | 06.03.2013 | SI | 06.03.2013 | SK | 06.03.2013 | TR | 06.03.2013 | IE | 24.04.2013 | LU | 24.04.2013 | CH | 30.04.2013 | LI | 30.04.2013 | BG | 06.06.2013 | GR | 07.06.2013 | ES | 17.06.2013 | IS | 06.07.2013 | PT | 08.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
TR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
IE | 24.04.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
DK | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
CH | 30.04.2013 | ||
LI | 30.04.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
MC | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.03.2013 | ||
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
PL | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
RO | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
SK | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
EE | 06.03.2013 | ||
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
IS | 06.07.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
PT | 08.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
LV | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
FI | 06.03.2013 | ||
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
SI | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
GR | 07.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 06.03.2013 | |
LT | 06.03.2013 | ||
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
ES | 17.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 06.03.2013 | |
SE | 06.03.2013 | ||
BG | 06.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 06.03.2013 | Cited in | International search | [PX]JP2005213225 ; | [A]EP0959062 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1156027 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2558520 (HOYT HOWARD E, et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR695931 (SCHERING KAHLBAUM AG) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5387720 (NEHER ARMIN [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 60, Database accession no. 2005-585659, XP002357723 & JP2005213225 A 20050811 (NIPPON SHOKUBAI CO LTD) [PX] 1-10 * abstract * |