EP1891048 - PYRAZOLE-SUBSTITUTED BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND AUTOIMMUNE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vernalis (R&D) Limited Oakdene Court 613 Reading Road Winnersh Berkshire RG14 5UA / GB | [2008/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALMSLEY, David, Lee VERNALIS R & D LTD. Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road Winnersh, Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | 02 /
DRYSDALE, Martin, James VERNALIS R & D LTD. Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road Winnersh, Wokingham, Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | 03 /
NORTHFIELD, Christopher J. VERNALIS R & D LTD. Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road Winnersh, Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | 04 /
FROMONT, Christophe VERNALIS R & D LTD. Oakdene Court, 613 Reading Road Winnersh, Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | [2008/09] | Representative(s) | Walls, Alan James Vernalis (R&D) Ltd Oakdene Court 613 Reading Road, Winnersh Wokinghma Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/09] | Walls, Alan James Vernalis (R&D) Ltd Oakdene Court 613 Reading Road, Winnersh Wokingham Berkshire RG41 5UA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06744125.3 | 06.06.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006GB02071 | Priority number, date | GB20050011947 | 11.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0511947 | GB20060007550 | 18.04.2006 Original published format: GB 0607550 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006134318 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1891048 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D487/04, C07D405/04, C07D453/02, C07D451/04, A61K31/4184, A61P35/00, A61P37/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
C07D451/04 (EP,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D401/14 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/09] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PYRAZOLSUBSTITUIERTE BENZIMIDAZOLDERIVATE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS UND AUTOIMMUNERKRANKUNGEN | [2008/09] | English: | PYRAZOLE-SUBSTITUTED BENZIMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND AUTOIMMUNE DISORDERS | [2008/09] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE BENZIMIDAZOLE SUBSTITUÉS AU PYRAZOLE POUR UNE UTILISATION DANS LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER ET DE TROUBLES AUTO-IMMUNS | [2008/09] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03035065 (AVENTIS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [X] 1-24* examples 235af,ah,ai,ak-am,ao-aq,246g-l,v-y,aa,etc; claims 14,194-199 * |