EP1893723 - REMOVAL OF NITROGEN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2012 [2012/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey PLC 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | For all designated states Johnson Matthey PLC 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states JOHNSON MATTHEY PLC 40-42 Hatton Garden London EC1N 8EE / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARNELL, Peter John Herbert 50 Hartburn Village Stockton On Tees, Cleveland TS18 5DP / GB | 02 /
COUSINS, Matthew John 234 Greenbank Road Darlington County, Durham DL3 6ES / GB | 03 /
CHALLIS, Lucy Jane Greystones, Milton Avenue, Bishop Auckland County, Durham DL14 6AN / GB | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Ridland, John, et al Johnson Matthey Catalysts Intellectual Property Dept. PO Box 1 Belasis Avenue, Billingham Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Ridland, John, et al Johnson Matthey Catalysts Intellectual Property Dept. PO Box 1 Belasis Avenue Billingham Cleveland TS23 1LB / GB | Application number, filing date | 06744342.4 | 07.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006GB50141 | Priority number, date | GB20050012459 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0512459 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136862 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893723 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C10G25/00, B01J20/28 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B01D15/00 (EP,US);
C10G25/003 (EP,US);
C10G67/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENTFERNUNG VON STICKSTOFFVERBINDUNGEN | [2008/10] | English: | REMOVAL OF NITROGEN COMPOUNDS | [2008/10] | French: | ÉLIMINATION DE COMPOSÉS AZOTÉS | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/26] | 07.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6456142 ; | [X]US4168225 (JACKSON HERMAN R) [X] 1-4,7,9-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0384906 (JACKSON HERMAN R [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1110602 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-8,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003085174 (ZAPPI MARK E [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,13-15 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1514917 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12,14,15* the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890609), vol. 013, no. 249, Database accession no. (C - 605), & JP01056142 A 19890303 (JAPAN EXLAN CO LTD; others: 01) [X] 1-4,6-9,13-15 * the whole document * |