EP1909791 - G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR AGONISTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROSIDION LTD Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford, Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBA, Oscar c/o Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 02 /
BRADLEY, Stuart Edward Prosidion Limite Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 03 /
FYFE, Matthew, Colin, Thor Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 04 /
BERTRAM, Lisa, Sarah Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 05 /
GATTRELL, William Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 06 /
PROCTER, Martin, James Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 07 /
RASAMISON, Chrystelle Marie Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | 08 /
SWAIN, Simon, Andrew Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford Oxfordshire OX4 6LT / GB | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | [2013/15] |
Former [2012/23] | Rands, Peter David, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Talbott, Dawn Jacqueline, et al Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford OX4 6LT / GB | ||
Former [2010/38] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky & Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street London EC2V 7JX / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Blakey, Alison Jane, et al Prosidion Limited Windrush Court Watlington Road Oxford OX4 6LT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06744362.2 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006GB50182 | Priority number, date | GB20050013276 | 30.06.2005 Original published format: GB 0513276 | GB20060012897 | 29.06.2006 Original published format: GB 0612897 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003964 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909791 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4545, A61K31/496, C07D211/20, C07D211/26, C07D401/04, C07D401/06, C07D401/12, C07D407/12, C07D413/12, C07D471/08, A61P3/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4545 (KR);
A61K31/496 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D211/20 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/26 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | 30.01.2008 | BA | 30.01.2008 | HR | 30.01.2008 | MK | 30.01.2008 | RS | 30.01.2008 | Title | German: | AGONISTEN DES G-PROTEIN-GEKOPPELTEN REZEPTORS | [2008/16] | English: | G-PROTEIN COUPLED RECEPTOR AGONISTS | [2008/16] | French: | AGONISTES DU RÉCEPTEUR COUPLÉ AUX PROTÉINES G | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 11.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2006067531 (PROSIDION LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-19 * claims 1,19 *; | [A]WO2005007647 (ARENA PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * claims 1,66 * |