blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1874313

EP1874313 - TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF OVARIAN HYPERSTIMULATION SYNDROME (OHSS) USING A DOPAMINE AGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.06.2011
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 19.06.2013  [2013/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ferring International Center S.A.
Chemin de la Vergognausaz 50
1162 Saint-Prex / CH
[2010/31]
Former [2008/02]For all designated states
Ferring International Center S.A.
Avenue de Rhodanie 60
1007 Lausanne / CH
Inventor(s)01 / PELLICER-MARTINEZ, Antonio
Jorge Juan, 8
ES-46004 Valencia / ES
02 / ARCE, Joan-Carlos
Sovej 100
DK-2791 Dragor / DK
03 / SIMON-VALLES, Carlos
Avda.Sauces, 7
ES-46110 Valencia / ES
04 / GOMEZ-GALLEGO, Raul
Carretera Segoribe,60
Vallduixo, 12600 Castellón de la Plana / ES
 [2010/09]
Former [2008/02]01 / PELLICER-MARTINEZ, Antonio
Jorge Juan, 8
ES-46004 Valencia / ES
02 / ARCE, Joan-Carlos
Sovej 100
DK-2791 Dragor / DK
03 / SIMON-VALLES, Carlos
Avda.Sauces, 7
ES-46110 Valencia / ES
04 / GOMEZ-GALLEGO, Raul
Carretera Segoribe,60
Vallduixo, 12600 Castell n de la Plana / ES
Representative(s)Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]Bates, Philip Ian
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date06744549.424.04.2006
[2008/02]
WO2006IB00989
Priority number, dateUS20050676165P29.04.2005         Original published format: US 676165 P
[2008/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2006117608
Date:09.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1874313
Date:09.01.2008
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1874313
Date:28.07.2010
Language:EN
[2010/30]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1874313
Date:01.09.2010
[2010/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.11.2006
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/48, A61K31/498, A61K31/00, A61P15/00
[2008/02]
CPC:
A61K31/00 (EP,US); A61K31/48 (EP,US); A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61P15/00 (EP); A61P5/00 (EP); A61P5/08 (EP);
A61P5/24 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/02]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
YUNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG DES OVARIELLEN ÜBERSTIMULATIONSSYNDROMS (OHSS) MIT EINEM DOPAMINAGONISTEN[2008/02]
English:TREATMENT OR PREVENTION OF OVARIAN HYPERSTIMULATION SYNDROME (OHSS) USING A DOPAMINE AGONIST[2008/02]
French:TRAITEMENT OU PREVENTION DU SYNDROME D'HYPERSTIMULATION OVARIENNE (OHSS) AU MOYEN D'UN AGONISTE DE LA DOPAMINE[2008/02]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2007National basic fee paid 
26.10.2007Designation fee(s) paid 
26.10.2007Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.10.2007Examination requested  [2008/02]
17.01.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.09.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
27.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.06.2010Fee for grant paid
16.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
LU24.04.2011
[2013/25]
Former [2011/29]CY28.07.2010
EE28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
RO28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
Former [2011/17]CY28.07.2010
LT28.07.2010
SI28.07.2010
BG28.10.2010
IS28.11.2010
Former [2011/09]LT28.07.2010
Cited inInternational search[X]  - PAPALEO ENRICO ET AL, "Cabergoline influences ovarian stimulation in hyperprolactinaemic patients with polycystic ovary syndrome", HUMAN REPRODUCTION (OXFORD), (200111), vol. 16, no. 11, ISSN 0268-1161, pages 2263 - 2266, XP002393408 [X] 1-50 * see abstract last sentence * * page 2264, column L, paragraphs 3-7 * * table II * * page 2265, column R, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/humrep/16.11.2263
 [X]  - GOMEZ RAUL ET AL, "Tyroxine hydroxylase (TH) downregulation in hyperstimulated ovaries reveals the dopamine agonist Bromocriptine (Br2) as an effective and specific method to block increased vascular permeability (VP) in OHSS.", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, & 59TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE; SAN ANTONIO, TEXAS, USA; OCTOBER 11-15, 2003, (200309), vol. 80, no. Suppl. 3, ISSN 0015-0282, pages S43 - S44, XP009070619 [X] 1-50 * See whole document, especially conclusion *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0015-0282(03)01918-6
 [X]  - MORRIS RANDY S ET AL, "Conservative management of ovarian hyperstimulation syndrome", JOURNAL OF REPRODUCTIVE MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 40, no. 10, ISSN 0024-7758, pages 711 - 714, XP009070629 [X] 1,2,29-34 * page 712, column R, paragraph 2; table I *
 [PX]  - MANNO ET AL, "Cabergoline: a safe, easy, cheap, and effective drug for prevention/treatment of ovarian hyperstimulation syndrome?", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF OBSTETRICS & GYNECOLOGY AND REPRODUCTIVE BIOLOGY, EXCERPTA MEDICA, AMSTERDAM,, NL, (20050901), vol. 122, no. 1, ISSN 0301-2115, pages 127 - 128, XP005067200 [PX] 1-50 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejogrb.2005.01.009
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.