EP1900161 - SCHEDULING INFORMATION AT SERVING CELL CHANGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2014/24] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEBIRE, Benoist East Lake Villas - A1103 35, Dongzhimenwai Dajie Beijing 100027 / CN | [2013/30] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
SEBIRE, Benoist East Lake Villas - A1103 35, Dongzhimenwai Dajie Beijing 100027 / CN | Representative(s) | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Ruuskanen, Juha-Pekka, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2008/12] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06744726.8 | 18.05.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006IB01305 | Priority number, date | US20050695873P | 05.07.2005 Original published format: US 695873 P | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007003991 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1900161 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900161 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/12, H04L29/08, H04L12/28, H04B7/005 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
H04L67/62 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W36/08 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W36/18 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR);
H04B2201/70722 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2013/01] | H04W72/12, H04L29/08, H04L12/56, H04L12/28, H04B7/005 | ||
Former IPC [2012/20] | H04L12/56, H04L12/28, H04W4/00, H04B7/005 | ||
Former IPC [2008/12] | H04L12/56, H04L12/28, H04Q7/38, H04B7/005 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINTEILUNG VON INFORMATIONEN BEI EINEM WECHSEL DER VERSORGUNGSZELLE | [2008/12] | English: | SCHEDULING INFORMATION AT SERVING CELL CHANGE | [2008/12] | French: | ORDONNANCEMENT DE DONNEES LORS D'UN CHANGEMENT DE CELLULE DE DESSERTE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 23.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2006 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | IT | 24.07.2013 | LT | 24.07.2013 | LV | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | IS | 24.11.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.05.2006 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
LV | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
IS | 24.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
LT | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 24.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2005018496 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | International search | [A]EP1447938 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [AP]WO2005125253 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [E]WO2006077141 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [E]WO2006081874 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [E]WO2006085167 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [E]EP1708523 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | WO2005018496 |