EP1886445 - ENHANCED SCANNING FOR ACCESS ENTITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PÖYHÖNEN, Jari Hatanpään Puistokuja 26 As. 7 FI-33900 Tampere / FI | 02 /
JAAKKOLA, Mikko Seurakuntatalontie 9 FI-37560 Lempäälä / FI | 03 /
SUOMI, Arto J. Näsilinnankatu 16 A 17 FI-33210 Tampere / FI | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06745008.0 | 23.05.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006IB51648 | Priority number, date | EP20050011723 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05011723 | GB20050015627 | 29.07.2005 Original published format: GB 0515627 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006129243 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1886445 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,US);
H04W28/14 (KR);
H04W72/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES SCANNEN FÜR ZUGANGSENTITÄTEN | [2008/07] | English: | ENHANCED SCANNING FOR ACCESS ENTITIES | [2008/07] | French: | BALAYAGE AMELIORE POUR ENTITES D'ACCES | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 10.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004192279 (BACKES FLOYD [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * page 11, paragraph 194 - page 12, paragraph 205 *; | [X] - MISHRA A ET AL, "AN EMPIRICAL ANALYSIS OF THE IEEE 802.11 MAC LAYER HANDOFF PROCESS", COMPUTER COMMUNICATION REVIEW, ACM, NEW YORK, NY, US, (200304), vol. 33, no. 2, ISSN 0146-4833, pages 93 - 102, XP001224635 [X] 1-30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/956981.956990 | [X] - "wireless LAN Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) Specifications", IEEE-SA STANDARDS BOARD 802.11, (20030612), pages 123 - 137, XP002410595 [X] 1-30 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2004192279 | - AN EMPIRICAL ANALYSIS OF THE IEEE 802.11 MAC LAYER HANDOFF PROCESS |