EP1891501 - METHOD FOR CONTROL OF A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2013/39] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2008/09] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
IT
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Lübeckertordamm 5 20099 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNEISSLER, Jan c/o Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Gmbh Weisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | [2018/35] |
Former [2008/09] | 01 /
KNEISSLER, Jan, Philips Int. Prop. &Stand. Gmbh W eisshausstr. 2 52066 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | de Haan, Poul Erik, et al Philips International B.V. Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2018/35] |
Former [2012/34] | Verweij, Petronella Danielle, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/09] | Groenendaal, Antonius W. M., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 06745016.3 | 24.05.2006 | [2008/09] | WO2006IB51658 | Priority number, date | EP20050104689 | 31.05.2005 Original published format: EP 05104689 | [2008/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006129249 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1891501 | Date: | 27.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1891501 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00 | [2008/09] | CPC: |
G06F3/0325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/35] |
Former [2008/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES GERÄTS | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROL OF A DEVICE | [2008/09] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN DISPOSITIF | [2008/09] |
Former [2008/09] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER VORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2008 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 01.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.05.2006 | AT | 29.08.2018 | CY | 29.08.2018 | CZ | 29.08.2018 | DK | 29.08.2018 | EE | 29.08.2018 | ES | 29.08.2018 | FI | 29.08.2018 | IT | 29.08.2018 | LT | 29.08.2018 | LV | 29.08.2018 | MC | 29.08.2018 | NL | 29.08.2018 | PL | 29.08.2018 | RO | 29.08.2018 | SE | 29.08.2018 | SI | 29.08.2018 | SK | 29.08.2018 | BG | 29.11.2018 | GR | 30.11.2018 | IS | 29.12.2018 | PT | 29.12.2018 | IE | 24.05.2019 | LU | 24.05.2019 | TR | 24.05.2019 | [2024/42] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 24.05.2006 | |
AT | 29.08.2018 | ||
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.05.2019 | ||
LU | 24.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CY | 29.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.05.2019 | ||
LU | 24.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
PT | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.05.2019 | ||
LU | 24.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
IE | 24.05.2019 | ||
LU | 24.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
LU | 24.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
MC | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SI | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
DK | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 29.08.2018 | |
CZ | 29.08.2018 | ||
EE | 29.08.2018 | ||
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
SK | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 29.08.2018 | |
ES | 29.08.2018 | ||
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
PL | 29.08.2018 | ||
RO | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
IT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | ES | 29.08.2018 | |
FI | 29.08.2018 | ||
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
LV | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
SE | 29.08.2018 | ||
BG | 29.11.2018 | ||
GR | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
NL | 29.08.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 29.08.2018 | |
LT | 29.08.2018 | ||
IS | 29.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 29.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2814026 (REZA YVES JEAN PAUL GUY [FR]) [X] 1-12 * page 3, line 5 - line 11; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [AD]WO2004047011 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 8, line 18 - page 9, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]JPH07121293 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]JPH11305935 (IMAGE TEC KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]DE10110979 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US6567032 (MULLALY JOHN MARTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]WO0135368 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0767443 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-12 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2003007104 (HOSHINO TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,10c; claim 1 * |