EP1866474 - TANDEM WASHING MACHINES CONFIGURATION FOR RECYCLING DETERGENT AND WATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/51] | TANDEM WASHING MACHINES CONFIGURATION FOR RECYCLING DETERGENT&WATER | ||
[2013/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agarwal, Sanjiv Fairtech Resources Pvt. Ltd. 25C/1, Belvedere Road Kolkata 700 027 / IN | [2008/35] |
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Agarwal, Sanjiv 25C/1 Belvedere Road Kolkata 700 027 / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06745199.7 | 20.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006IN00096 | Priority number, date | IN2005KOL0232 | 28.03.2005 Original published format: IN KO02322005 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006103700 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866474 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1866474 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AT | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/00 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
D06F31/00 (EP,KR,US);
D06F34/18 (KR);
D06F34/22 (KR);
D06F34/28 (KR);
D06F2103/20 (KR);
D06F2105/58 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Title | German: | DOPPELKONFIGURATION EINER WASCHMASCHINE FÜR RECYCLING VON WASCHMITTEL UND WASSER | [2007/51] | English: | TANDEM WASHING MACHINES CONFIGURATION FOR RECYCLING DETERGENT AND WATER | [2013/45] | French: | MONTAGE EN TANDEM DE MACHINES A LAVER POUR LE RECYCLAGE DE DETERGENTS ET DE L'EAU | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/51] | TANDEM WASHING MACHINES CONFIGURATION FOR RECYCLING DETERGENT&WATER | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 27.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.09.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.03.2006 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0688894 (FORON WASCHGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6,8,10 * column 3, line 38 - column 5, line 6; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5,7,9; | [PXA]WO2006012793 (YANG YE [CN]) [PX] 1,10 * abstract *[PA] 2-9 | International search | [X]US4441340 (KAPLAN DARRYL [US]); | [Y]DE4313539 (FORON WASCHGERAETE GMBH [DE]); | [X]US5501792 (CARROLL JR JOHN D [US]); | [X]GB2339578 (BISHOP ALLAN [GB]) | by applicant | EP0688894 | US5501792 |