EP1994294 - ANNULAR SEALING ASSEMBLY, IN PARTICULAR FOR WHEEL HUBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Aktiebolaget SKF 415 50 Göteborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOTI, Claudio Corso IV Novembre, 2 I-14010 Dusino San Michele / IT | 02 /
SERAFINI, Andrea Via Vecchia di Buriasco, 12/D I-10064 Pinerolo / IT | 03 /
BRUNETTI, Marco Via Chambery 91/8 I-10142 Torino / IT | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Plebani, Rinaldo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06745238.3 | 20.03.2006 | [2008/48] | WO2006IT00171 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007108018 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | IT | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1994294 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994294 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/78 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
F16J15/3256 (EP,US);
F16C33/76 (KR);
F16C19/00 (KR);
F16C33/78 (KR);
F16C33/7879 (EP,US);
F16C35/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RINGDICHTUNGSANORDNUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR RADNABEN | [2008/48] | English: | ANNULAR SEALING ASSEMBLY, IN PARTICULAR FOR WHEEL HUBS | [2008/48] | French: | ENSEMBLE D'ETANCHEITE ANNULAIRE, EN PARTICULIER POUR DES MOYEUX DE ROUE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2006 | Translation filed | 30.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 19.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.05.2010 | BE | 05.05.2010 | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | PT | 06.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
BE | 05.05.2010 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
PT | 06.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 05.05.2010 | |
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP0980999 (RFT SPA [IT]) [I] 1-3 * paragraphs [0010] - [0023]; figure 1 * [A] 8; | [A]EP1241368 (SKF IND SPA [IT]) [A] 6* figure 1 *; | [A]US2003016892 (VIGNOTTO ANGELO [IT], et al) [A] 5,7,8 * paragraph [0019]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004036226 (HOSODA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 4,7 * paragraphs [0024] - [0032]; figures 1,2 * |