EP1882288 - FIXING CLIP FOR WALL MOUNTING OF AN ELECTRIC APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTICINO S.P.A. Viale Borri, 231 21100 Varese / IT | [2014/26] |
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states BTICINO S.p.A. Via Messina, 38 20154 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE AMBROGGI, Renato Vicolo San Bartolomeo, 16 I-21034 Cocquio Trevisago (Varese) / IT | 02 /
PIANEZZOLA, Enrico Via Padre Umberto Bianchi, 9 I-21020 Luvinate (Varese) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | 01 /
DE AMBROGGI, Renato Vicolo San Bartolomeo, 16 I-21034 Cocquio Trevisago (Varese) / IT | ||
02 /
PIANEZZOLA, Enrico Via Padre Umberto Bianchi, 9 I-21020 Luvinate / IT | Representative(s) | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Tomacelli 146 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/05] | Carangelo, Pierluigi, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via delle Quattro Fontane, 15 00184 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 06745324.1 | 04.05.2006 | [2008/05] | WO2006IT00314 | Priority number, date | IT2005RM00240 | 17.05.2005 Original published format: IT RM20050240 | [2008/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006123380 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | IT | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1882288 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/12 | [2008/05] | CPC: |
H02G3/12 (KR);
H02G3/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FIXIERUNGSCLIP ZUR WANDANBRINDUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | [2008/05] | English: | FIXING CLIP FOR WALL MOUNTING OF AN ELECTRIC APPARATUS | [2008/05] | French: | CLIP DE FIXATION POUR MONTAGE DE PAROI D'APPAREIL ELECTRIQUE | [2008/05] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | Translation filed | 14.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 02.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/50] | 21.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4033914 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,5-7,9,10 * the whole document *; | [PA]FR2866758 (SIMON SA [ES]) [PA] 1,5-8,10 * the whole document *; | ES1056620U [ ] (SIMON SA [ES]) [ ] * Not available * |