EP1873486 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING ABNORMALITY IN OUTER SHAPE OF TIRE SIDE SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2019 [2019/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2008/01] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUYAMA, Kenji@BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center, 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 1878531 / JP | [2018/33] |
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
KOUYAMA, Kenji BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center, 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 1878531 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/33] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2008/01] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06745554.3 | 21.04.2006 | [2008/01] | WO2006JP308423 | Priority number, date | JP20050124872 | 22.04.2005 Original published format: JP 2005124872 | [2008/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006115203 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873486 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873486 | Date: | 15.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01M17/02, G01B21/30, G01B11/24 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G01M17/027 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/23] | G01M17/02, G01B21/30, // B60C19/00, G01B21/20 | ||
Former IPC [2008/01] | G01B21/20, B60C19/00, G01M17/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2018/33] |
Former [2008/31] | DE, FR, IT | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG EINER ABNORMITÄT DER ÄUSSEREN FORM EINES REIFENSEITENTEILS | [2008/01] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING ABNORMALITY IN OUTER SHAPE OF TIRE SIDE SECTION | [2008/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION D'IMPERFECTION DANS LA FORME EXTERNE DE LA SECTION DE FLANC DE PNEU | [2008/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2007 | Translation filed | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5313827 (YOVICHIN ALBERT J [US]) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4; | [XY]WO0248648 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * abstract * * figures 3,5,6 * * page 16 - page 21 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]JP2003266445 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND) [Y] 3,4* the whole document * | Examination | EP0328384 | DE19849793 |