EP1929953 - ULTRASONOGRAPH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SABATA, Tomohiro c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 02 /
OBA, Kenichi c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | 03 /
KANBARA, Tadaaki c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2012/26] |
Former [2008/24] | 01 /
SABATA, Tomohiro c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
OBA, Kenichi c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
KANBARA, Tadaaki c/o OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP. 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06745715.0 | 26.04.2006 | [2008/24] | WO2006JP308737 | Priority number, date | JP20050278749 | 26.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005278749 | [2008/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007034590 | Date: | 29.03.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929953 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929953 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/06 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A61B8/06 (EP,US);
G01S15/8979 (EP,US);
G01S7/52071 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/44] |
Former [2008/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLGERÄT | [2008/24] | English: | ULTRASONOGRAPH | [2008/24] | French: | ULTRASONOGRAPHE | [2008/24] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | Translation filed | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 29.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |