EP2015065 - METHOD OF QUANTIFYING NEUROTOXIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 25.04.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 1-6-1 Okubo Kita-ku Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 23-1, Toyama 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8640 / JP | [2013/08] |
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Juridical Foundation The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken 860-8568 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 23-1, Toyama 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8640 / JP | |||
Former [2011/38] | For all designated states Juridical Foundation The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken 860-8568 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 23-1, Toyama-cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8640 / JP | |||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Juridical Foundation The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken 860-8568 / JP | ||
For all designated states JAPAN as represented by DIRECTOR GENERAL OF NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 1-23-1, Toyama, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8640 / JP | |||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Juridical Foundation The Chemo-Sero-Therapeutic Research Institute 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi Kumamoto-ken 860-8568 / JP | ||
For all designated states Japan as Repres. by Director Gral of National Institute of Infectious Diseases 23-1, Toyama 1-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 162-8640 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARAKAWA, Tetsuhiro JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST. 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | 02 /
NAKANO, Hirotoshi JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST. 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | 03 /
TORII, Yasushi JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST. 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | 04 /
OKUDA, Sachio JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST. 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | 05 /
KAJI, Ryuji The University of Tokushima Faculty of Medicine 18-15, Kuramoto-cho 3-chome Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8503 / JP | 06 /
SAKAMOTO, Takashi Kohnodai Hosp., The Nat. Center of Neurol.&Psych. 1-7-1, Kohnodai Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-8516 / JP | 07 /
TAKAHASHI, Motohide National Institute of Infectious Diseases 4-7-1, Gakuen Musashimurayama-shi, Tokyo 208-0011 / JP | 08 /
ISHIDA, Setsuji 19-3, Akitsu 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0025 / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2009/03] | 01 /
HARAKAWA, Tetsuhiro JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST., 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKANO, Hirotoshi JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST., 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | |||
03 /
TORII, Yasushi JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST., 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | |||
04 /
OKUDA, Sachio JURID.FOUND. CHEMO-SERO-THERAP. RES. INST., 6-1, Okubo 1-chome Kumamoto-shi, Kumamoto 860-8568 / JP | |||
05 /
KAJI, Ryuji The University of Tokushima Faculty of Medicine, 18-15, Kuramoto-cho 3-chome Tokushima-shi, Tokushima 770-8503 / JP | |||
06 /
SAKAMOTO, Takashi Kohnodai Hosp., The Nat. Center of Neurol.&Psych., 1-7-1, Kohnodai Ichikawa-shi, Chiba 272-8516 / JP | |||
07 /
TAKAHASHI, Motohide National Institute of Infectious Diseases, 4-7-1, Gakuen Musashimurayama-shi, Tokyo 208-0011 / JP | |||
08 /
ISHIDA, Setsuji 19-3, Akitsu 4-chome Narashino-shi, Chiba 275-0025 / JP | Representative(s) | Meier, Jürgen Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Meier, Jürgen Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/03] | Meier, Jürgen Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06745899.2 | 28.04.2006 | [2009/03] | WO2006JP309040 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007125604 | Date: | 08.11.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015065 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2015065 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/15, G01N33/50 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G01N33/5088 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
G01N33/94 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR QUANTIFIZIERUNG VON NEUROTOXIN | [2009/03] | English: | METHOD OF QUANTIFYING NEUROTOXIN | [2009/03] | French: | PROCEDE DE QUANTIFICATION D'UNE NEUROTOXINE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2008 | Translation filed | 28.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 07.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2010 | 10.12.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US Opponent's representative Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US Opponent's representative HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 DE-81925 München / DE | 22.08.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.04.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2006 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 28.04.2012 | LU | 28.04.2012 | CH | 30.04.2012 | LI | 30.04.2012 | MC | 30.04.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 28.04.2012 | ||
CH | 30.04.2012 | ||
LI | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1491205 (JURIDICAL FOUNDATION [JP]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 8; example 3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [DX] - CICHON J V JR ET AL, "The effect of botulinum toxin type A injection on compound muscle action potential in an in vivo rat model.", THE LARYNGOSCOPE FEB 1995, (199502), vol. 105, no. 2, ISSN 0023-852X, pages 144 - 148, XP008104222 [DX] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 144 - page 145 * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1288/00005537-199502000-00006 | [X] - DODD S L ET AL, "A comparison of the spread of three formulations of botulinum neurotoxin A as determined by effects on muscle function", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF NEUROLOGY, (199803), vol. 5, no. 2, ISSN 1351-5101, pages 181 - 186, XP002520878 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * * page 182 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1468-1331.1998.520181.x | [A] - KOPMAN AARON F ET AL, "An alternate method for estimating the dose-response relationships of neuromuscular blocking drugs", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200005), Database accession no. PREV200000243742, XP002520879 [A] 1-15 * abstract * | [ ] - ANESTHESIA AND ANALGESIA, (200005), vol. 90, no. 5, ISSN 0003-2999, pages 1191 - 1197 | Examination | - KIM HYEON SOOK ET AL, "Effect of muscle activity and botulinum toxin dilution volume on muscle paralysis", DEVELOPMENTAL MEDICINE AND CHILD NEUROLOGY, (2003), vol. 45, no. 3, pages 200 - 206 |