Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7598734 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2009 | B2 | US2008315868 | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | WO2006JP309532 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7679361 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2010 | B2 | US2008258739 | 23.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP309534 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006317284 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006317283 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244068 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | A3 | EP2244068 | 27.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06746329 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244067 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2013 | A3 | EP2244067 | 27.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06746329 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2236989 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2012 | A3 | EP2236989 | 06.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | EP06746331 | 12.05.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1785697 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2013 | B8 | EP1785697 | 31.07.2013 | B1 | EP1785697 | 30.12.2009 | A4 | EP1785697 | 16.05.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | WO2006JP309532 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1881298 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2009 | A4 | EP1881298 | 23.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP309534 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100473951C | 01.04.2009 | C | CN101031778 | 05.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101031779B | 28.07.2010 | B | CN101031779 | 05.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006JP309534 | 12.05.2006 | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006121146 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006121145 | Global Dossier | 16.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100868011B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2008 | B1 | KR20070054721 | 29.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100820262B | Global Dossier | 08.04.2008 | B1 | KR20070069145 | 02.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2005140208 | 12.05.2005 | JP2005140207 | 12.05.2005 | Type | Divisional application | EP2236989 |