EP1881036 - BIODEGRADABLE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE PRODUCED FROM THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima Kita-ku Osaka / JP | [2015/16] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-3-18, Nakanoshima, Kita-ku Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 2-4, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AOYAMA, Taizo, c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Nobuo, c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | 03 /
HASHIMOTO, Yoshihiko, c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Noriyuki, c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | [2014/47] |
Former [2008/04] | 01 /
AOYAMA, Taizo c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAMURA, Nobuo c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | |||
03 /
HASHIMOTO, Yoshihiko c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Noriyuki c/o Kaneka Corporation Osaka Plant, 5-1-1, Torikainishi Settsu-shi, Osaka, 566-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/04] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746332.3 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/04] | WO2006JP309535 | Priority number, date | JP20050141963 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005141963 | JP20050151334 | 24.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005151334 | [2008/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006121147 | Date: | 16.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881036 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881036 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08L67/04, C08L33/06, C08L51/00, C08L101/16 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F283/12 (EP,US);
C08L33/14 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/053 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L33/14, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L2666/02 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2008/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER FORMKÖRPER | [2008/04] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE PRODUCED FROM THE SAME | [2008/04] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE BIODEGRADABLE ET ARTICLE MOULE PRODUIT A PARTIR DE LADITE COMPOSITION | [2008/04] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2007 | Translation filed | 15.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 07.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2006 | AT | 15.04.2015 | BE | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | IT | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | IE | 12.05.2015 | LU | 12.05.2015 | CH | 31.05.2015 | LI | 31.05.2015 | FR | 15.06.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 12.05.2006 | |
AT | 15.04.2015 | ||
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
BG | 15.04.2015 | ||
CY | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SE | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
TR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 15.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 15.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
FR | 15.06.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
IE | 12.05.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
CH | 31.05.2015 | ||
LI | 31.05.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |