EP1900809 - METHOD OF PREPARING CELL FOR BONE TISSUE FORMATION AND APPLICATION OF CELL FOR BONE TISSUE FORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 464-8601 / JP | For all designated states Arblast Co., Ltd. Kobe International Business Center Building 5-5-2, Minatojima-minamimachi, Chuo-ku Kobe city, Hyogo 650-0047 / JP | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UEDA, Minoru, Nat. Univ. Corp. Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4648601 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Yoichi, Nat. Univ. Corp. Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4648601 / JP | 03 /
SHIMA, Nobuyuki 2-1-20, Oodogahira-cho, Nada-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 6570014 / JP | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/12] | 01 /
UEDA, Minoru, Nat. Univ. Corp. Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 4648601 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMADA, Yoichi, Nat. Univ. Corp. Nagoya University 1, Furo-cho, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4648601 / JP | |||
03 /
SHIMA, Nobuyuki 4F, New Rokkou Heights 3-17-8, obanoyama-cho, Shinohara, Nada-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6570015 / JP | Representative(s) | Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke Patentanwälte PartG mbB Rechtsanwalts- und Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 1140 52412 Jülich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Postfach 31 01 40 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | Müller Fottner Steinecke Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte, Postfach 31 01 40 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06746345.5 | 12.05.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006JP309548 | Priority number, date | JP20050143443 | 17.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005143443 | [2008/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006123579 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900809 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/00, A61L27/00, C12N5/06 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
C12N5/0654 (EP,US);
A61L27/3608 (EP,US);
A61L27/365 (EP,US);
A61L27/3804 (EP,US);
A61L27/3847 (EP,US);
A61L27/3895 (EP,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61L2430/02 (EP,US);
C12N2501/998 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR PRÄPARATION SOWIE ANWENDUNG EINER ZELLE ZUR BILDUNG VON KNOCHENGEWEBE | [2008/12] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING CELL FOR BONE TISSUE FORMATION AND APPLICATION OF CELL FOR BONE TISSUE FORMATION | [2008/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION CELLULAIRE POUR LA FORMATION DE TISSU OSSEUX ET APPLICATION DE CELLULE POUR LA FORMATION DE TISSU OSSEUX | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2007 | Translation filed | 14.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/02] | 26.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004185085 (OCHI MITSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1 * page 4 - page 5; figure 3; claim 2 *; | [X] - SANCHEZ A R ET AL, "IS PLATELET-RICH PLASMA THE PERFECT ENHANCEMENT FACTOR? A CURRENT REVIEW", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL IMPLANTS, QUINTESSENCE PUBL., CHICAGO, IL, US, (20020101), vol. 18, no. 1, ISSN 0882-2786, pages 93 - 103, XP008075705 [X] 2-7 * page 98 * | [X] - LANDESBERG R ET AL, "Quantification of growth factor levels using a simplified method of platelet-rich plasma gel preparation", JOURNAL OF ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20000301), vol. 58, no. 3, ISSN 0278-2391, pages 297 - 300, XP004551734 [X] 2-7 * page 298 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0278-2391(00)90058-2 | [X] - BUTTERFIELD K J ET AL, "Effect of platelet-rich plasma with autogenous bone graft for maxillary sinus augmentation in a rabbit model", JOURNAL OF ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY, SAUNDERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20050301), vol. 63, no. 3, ISSN 0278-2391, pages 370 - 376, XP004760498 [X] 2-7 * page 371; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.joms.2004.07.017 | [X] - THORN J J ET AL, "Autologous fibrin glue with growth factors in reconstructive maxillofacial surgery.", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ORAL AND MAXILLOFACIAL SURGERY JAN 2004, (200401), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0901-5027, pages 95 - 100, XP009114830 [X] 2-7 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1054/ijom.2003.0461 |