EP1894976 - POLYMER COMPOSITION AND POLYMER LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Tomoyuki 2-40-1-512, Kasuga, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 3050821 / JP | 02 /
IIMURA, Kiyotoshi 2-13-10-402, Amakubo, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 3050005 / JP | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/15] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/29] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06746610.2 | 18.05.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006JP309935 | Priority number, date | JP20050148204 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005148204 | JP20050148205 | 20.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005148205 | [2008/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006123741 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | JA | [2006/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1894976 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1894976 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08L101/12, C08K5/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/50, H05B33/10 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
C08K5/0008 (EP,US);
C08K5/06 (KR);
H10K85/10 (US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
C08L25/04 (KR);
C09K11/025 (US);
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K71/135 (EP,KR,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1033 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1037 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1092 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1416 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1425 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1433 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1458 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1466 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1475 (EP,US);
C09K2211/185 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/15 (US);
H10K50/16 (US);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K71/15 (EP,US);
H10K71/40 (EP,KR);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2015/40] |
Former [2008/24] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND LICHTEMITTIERENDE POLYMERVORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2008/10] | English: | POLYMER COMPOSITION AND POLYMER LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE USING SAME | [2008/10] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMERIQUE ET DISPOSITIF POLYMERIQUE ELECTROLUMINESCENT L'UTILISANT | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2007 | Translation filed | 18.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 21.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2013 | Observations by third parties | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10007569.6 / EP2236561 | EP15178355.2 / EP2960299 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9926286 (AMOCO CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-21* examples 1-16; claims 1-16 *; | [X]WO0222710 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-4; claims 1-16 *; | [X]EP1229063 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-16; claims 1-18 *; | [X]US2004170861 (CULLIGAN SEAN W [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-6; claims 1-19 *; | [X]US2005005285 (OLSON DANIEL ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-5; claims 1-34 *; | [X]US2005004303 (MIYAKAWA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-7; claims 1-10 *; | [E]WO2006058182 (KELLY STEPHEN M [GB], et al) [E] 1-21 * examples 1-29; claims 1-103 *; | [E]WO2006113205 (DU PONT [US], et al) [E] 1-21 * examples 1-18; claims 1-22 * | Examination | JP2003308969 | JP2004119351 | EP1850368 | other | JP2003308969 | JP2004119351 | EP1850368 |